blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0498169

EP0498169 - Opto-electronic device for coupling and uncoupling of radiation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.10.1996
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.1996No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.12.1996 [1996/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/33]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
D-80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Stegmüller, Bernhard, Dr. Ing.
Seefelderstrasse 18
W-8900 Augsburg / DE
02 / Franz, Gerhard, Dr. Dipl.-Chem.
Wilhelm-Kuhnert-Strasse 2
W-8000 München 90 / DE
03 / Heinen, Jochen, Dr. Ing.
Dianastrasse 38
W-8013 Haar / DE
[1992/33]
Application number, filing date92100524.514.01.1992
[1992/33]
Priority number, dateDE1991410393008.02.1991         Original published format: DE 4103930
[1992/33]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0498169
Date:12.08.1992
Language:DE
[1992/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0498169
Date:20.12.1995
Language:DE
[1995/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.04.1992
ClassificationIPC:G02B6/30, G02B6/42
[1992/33]
CPC:
G02B6/1245 (EP,US); G02B6/30 (EP,US); G02B6/42 (EP,US);
G02B6/4204 (EP,US); G02B6/4214 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1992/33]
TitleGerman:Optoelektronisches Bauelement zum Aus- und Einkoppeln von Strahlung[1992/33]
English:Opto-electronic device for coupling and uncoupling of radiation[1992/33]
French:Composant opto-électronique pour couplage et découplage de rayonnement[1992/33]
MiscellaneousEPB 1995/51: Teilanmeldung 95103073.3 eingereicht am 14/01/92
EPB 1995/51: Divisional application 95103073.3 filed on 14/01/92
EPB 1995/51: Demande divisionnaire 95103073.3 déposée le 14/01/92
Examination procedure03.09.1992Examination requested  [1992/44]
21.02.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.06.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.03.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.06.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.09.1995Fee for grant paid
15.09.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP95103073.3  / EP0658784
Opposition(s)21.09.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1996/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.01.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
19.01.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]JP1307707  ;
 [A]US4163953  (DYMENT JOHN C [CA], et al);
 [A]EP0164834  (PLESSEY OVERSEAS [GB]);
 [A]DE3914835
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 104 (P-1013)26. Februar 1990 & JP-A-1 307 707 ( NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE CORP. ) 12. Dezember 1989, & JP1307707 A 00000000
 [XD]  - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS. Bd. 56, Nr. 13, 26. März 1990, NEW YORK US Seiten 1219 - 1221; LIAU ET AL.: 'GaInAsP / InP buried-heterostructure surface-emitting diode laser with monolithic integrated bifocal microlens'
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.