blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0504635

EP0504635 - Water/air radiator for watercooled internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.12.1994
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.1994No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.01.1995 [1995/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Behr GmbH & Co.
Mauserstrasse 3
70469 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/39]For all designated states
Behr GmbH & Co.
Mauserstrasse 3
D-70469 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Lenz, Werner
Wacholderweg 8
W-7130 Mühlacker / DE
02 / Wäsch, Artur, Dipl.-Ing. FH
Amselweg 19
W-7141 Grossbottwar / DE
[1992/39]
Representative(s)Wilhelm & Dauster
Hospitalstrasse 8
70174 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/39]Wilhelm & Dauster Patentanwälte European Patent Attorneys
Hospitalstrasse 8
D-70174 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date92103308.027.02.1992
[1992/39]
Priority number, dateDE1991410928421.03.1991         Original published format: DE 4109284
[1992/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0504635
Date:23.09.1992
Language:DE
[1992/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0504635
Date:02.02.1994
Language:DE
[1994/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.07.1992
ClassificationIPC:F28F9/00
[1992/39]
CPC:
F28F9/001 (EP); F28F2275/085 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1992/39]
TitleGerman:Wasser-/Luft-Kühler für wassergekühlte Verbrennungskraftmaschinen[1992/39]
English:Water/air radiator for watercooled internal combustion engine[1992/39]
French:Radiateur eau/air pour moteurs à combustion interne refroidis par eau[1992/39]
Examination procedure16.10.1992Examination requested  [1992/51]
04.02.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.06.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.07.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.08.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.10.1993Fee for grant paid
16.10.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.11.1994No opposition filed within time limit [1995/04]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE3428857  (SUEDDEUTSCHE KUEHLER BEHR [DE]);
 [A]EP0346602  (SUEDDEUTSCHE KUEHLER BEHR [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.