Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0502473

EP0502473 - Microbicidal benzo-1,2,3-thiadiazole derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2001
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.12.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 11.02.2004  [2004/07]
Applicant(s)For:BE  CH  LI  DE  DK  ES  FR  GB  GR  IT  LU  NL  PT  SE 
Novartis AG
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
For:AT 
Novartis-Erfindungen Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H.
Brunner Strasse 59
1235 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [1999/10]For:BE  CH  LI  DE  DK  ES  FR  GB  GR  IT  LU  NL  PT  SE 
Novartis AG
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
For:AT 
Novartis-Erfindungen Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H.
Brunner Strasse 59
1235 Wien / AT
Former [1997/14]For all designated states
Novartis AG
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
Former [1992/37]For all designated states
CIBA-GEIGY AG
Klybeckstrasse 141
CH-4002 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Kunz, Walter, Dr.
Buchenstrasse 9
CH-4104 Oberwil / CH
02 / Schurter, Rolf, Dr.
Holzmattstrasse 45
CH-4102 Binningen / CH
[1992/37]
Representative(s)Zumstein jun., Fritz , et al
Patentanwälte
Dr. F. Zumstein
Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen
Bräuhausstrasse 4
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/06]Zumstein, Fritz, Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte, Dr. F. Zumstein, Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen, Bräuhausstrasse 4
D-80331 München / DE
Former [1992/37]Zumstein, Fritz, Dr.
Patentanwälte Dr. F. Zumstein, Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen Bräuhausstrasse 4
D-80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date92103607.503.03.1992
[1992/37]
Priority number, dateCH1991000066606.03.1991         Original published format: CH 66691
[1992/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0502473
Date:09.09.1992
Language:DE
[1992/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0502473
Date:26.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.06.1992
ClassificationInternational:C07D285/14, A01N43/82
[1992/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1992/37]
TitleGerman:Mikrobizide Benzo-1,2,3-thiadiazolderivate[1992/37]
English:Microbicidal benzo-1,2,3-thiadiazole derivatives[1992/37]
French:Dérivés de benzo-1,2,3-thiadiazole microbicides[1992/37]
Examination procedure09.03.1993Examination requested  [1993/19]
20.02.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.06.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.10.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.02.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.12.1999Fee for grant paid
16.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
15.02.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
27.01.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
09.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
09.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
17.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR26.04.2000
PT26.07.2000
SE26.07.2000
[2004/07]
Former [2001/26]PT26.07.2000
SE26.07.2000
Former [2001/16]PT26.07.2000
Documents cited:Search[YD]GB1176799  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]);
 [Y]EP0313512  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH])
 [XD]  JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, SECTION C 1971, LONDON GB Seiten 3994 - 3999; E. HADDOCK ET AL.: '1,2,3-Benzothiadiazoles. Part V. The Rearrangement of Diazonium Salts derived from 7-Aminobenzisothiazoles',
 [XD]  JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL RESEARCH, MINIPRINT 1980, LONDON GB Seiten 2845 - 2866; K. CLARKE ET AL.: 'Condensed Isothiazoles. Part 7. Substitution Reactions of 3-Methyl-1,2-benzisothiazoles and Some of Its 4 and 5-Substituted Derivatives',