Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0503662

EP0503662 - Approximating apparatus for surgical jaw structure [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.1998
Database last updated on 14.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.04.1998No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.05.1998 [1998/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
United States Surgical Corporation
150 Glover Avenue Norwalk
Connecticut 06856 / US
[N/P]
Former [1992/38]For all designated states
United States Surgical Corporation
150 Glover Avenue
Norwalk, Connecticut 06856 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Green, David T.
28 Bermuda Road
Westport, CT 06880 / US
02 / Blewett, Jeffrey J.
86 Parkview Drive
Plantsville, CT 06479 / US
03 / Bolanos, Henry
54 Myrtle Street
East Norwalk, CT 06855 / US
04 / Ratcliff, Keith
36 Toddy Hill Road
Sandy Hook, CT 06482 / US
05 / Viola, Frank J.
366 Greatquarter Road
Sandy Hook, CT 06482 / US
06 / Sherts, Charles R.
65 South Gate Lane
Southport, CT 06490 / US
[1992/38]
Representative(s)Marsh, Roy David , et al
Hoffmann Eitle
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/38]Marsh, Roy David , et al
Hoffmann Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20
D-81904 München / DE
Application number, filing date92104388.113.03.1992
[1992/38]
Priority number, dateUS1991066935214.03.1991         Original published format: US 669352
US1991070362521.05.1991         Original published format: US 703625
[1992/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0503662
Date:16.09.1992
Language:EN
[1992/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0503662
Date:04.06.1997
Language:EN
[1997/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.06.1992
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/30
[1992/38]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1992/38]
TitleGerman:Näherungsvorrichtung für chirurgische Klemmbackenstruktur[1992/38]
English:Approximating apparatus for surgical jaw structure[1992/38]
French:Dispositif de rapprochement pour une structure chirurgicale à mâchoires[1992/38]
Examination procedure16.10.1992Examination requested  [1992/51]
05.09.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.03.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.08.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.11.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.05.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.10.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.12.1996Fee for grant paid
23.12.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.03.1998No opposition filed within time limit [1998/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US4171701  (FLEISCHHAUER EUGENE T [US], et al);
 [X]EP0406724  (WECK & CO INC EDWARD [US]);
 [A]EP0092300  (ETHICON INC [US]);
 [A]EP0211114  (AMERICAN HOSPITAL SUPPLY CORP [US]);
 [A]US3618842  (BRYAN GRAHAM W)
ExaminationUS4607636