blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0515799

EP0515799 - Reactor for phase-heterogeneous reactions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.02.1995
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.1995No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.04.1995 [1995/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HÜLS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
45764 Marl / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/49]For all designated states
HÜLS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
D-45764 Marl / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Piotrowski, Bernhard, Dr.
Alte Lohmarer Strasse 84
W-5204 Lohmar 1 / DE
02 / Korte, Hermann-Josef, Dr.
Stahlenstrasse 33
W-5216 Niederkassel 2 / DE
[1992/49]
Application number, filing date92105680.002.04.1992
[1992/49]
Priority number, dateDE1991411759229.05.1991         Original published format: DE 4117592
[1992/49]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0515799
Date:02.12.1992
Language:DE
[1992/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0515799
Date:13.04.1994
Language:DE
[1994/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.09.1992
ClassificationIPC:B01J10/00, B01J19/24, B01F3/04, C07C69/76
[1992/49]
CPC:
B01J19/2435 (EP,US); B01J10/00 (KR); B01F23/23231 (EP,US);
B01F23/2368 (EP,US); C07C67/39 (EP,US); B01J2219/00081 (EP,US);
Y02P20/582 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
C07C67/39, C07C69/76 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1992/49]
TitleGerman:Reaktor für phasenheterogene Reaktionen[1992/49]
English:Reactor for phase-heterogeneous reactions[1992/49]
French:Réacteur pour des réactions aux phases hétérogènes[1992/49]
Examination procedure08.12.1992Examination requested  [1993/05]
23.06.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.10.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.12.1993Fee for grant paid
13.12.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.01.1995No opposition filed within time limit [1995/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.03.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]FR1512557  (OLEOSTIN);
 [A]DE1264413  (OLEOSTIN S A R L);
 [A]GB1580177  (TODD J J);
 [AD]US4342876  (KLINGMAN GILBERT E)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.