EP0511607 - Method and apparatus for altering a digital image size [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 23.12.1999 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sterling Diagnostic Imaging, Inc. Glasgow Business Community, Blgd. 600, Route 896 Glasgow, DE 19702 / US | [1996/31] |
Former [1992/45] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Faulhaber, Mark Edwin 2419 Brookshire Drive Wilmington, Delaware 19803 / US | 02 /
Taylor, Robert Montgomery 38 Harris Circle Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | [1992/45] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/45] | Hilleringmann, Jochen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 92107101.5 | 25.04.1992 | [1992/45] | Priority number, date | US19910692654 | 29.04.1991 Original published format: US 692654 | [1992/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0511607 | Date: | 04.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0511607 | Date: | 24.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0511607 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/52] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0511607 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/393 | [1993/08] | CPC: |
G06T3/4007 (EP,US);
H04N1/3875 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/45] | H04N1/387 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Abänderung der Grösse digitaler Bilder | [1992/45] | English: | Method and apparatus for altering a digital image size | [1992/45] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour modifier la dimension d'images numériques | [1992/45] | Examination procedure | 18.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/41] | 26.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.09.1997
ADMISSIBLE Spandern, Uwe Werther Strasse 93 46395 Bocholt / DE Opponent's representative Roth, Ronald G. Patentanwalt, Altostrasse 6 81245 München / DE | [1997/49] | 05.11.1997 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.05.1998 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.03.1999 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 19.03.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.04.1999 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.04.1999 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.09.1999 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 02.12.1999 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3116223 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]); | [A]US4394693 (SHIRLEY ROBERT E); | [AD]EP0179553 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US], et al) |