blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0521280

EP0521280 - Axial separator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.06.1996
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip14.06.1996No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 31.07.1996 [1996/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Deere & Company
One John Deere Place
Moline, IL 61265 / US
[N/P]
Former [1993/01]For all designated states
DEERE & COMPANY
1 John Deere Road
Moline, Illinois 61265 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Jensen, Roderick James
980 N.Shore Drive
Moline, Illinois 61265 / US
02 / Weber, Jerome Lawrence
RR 1, Box 239B
Aledo, Illinois 61231 / US
[1993/01]
Representative(s)Feldmann, Bernhard, et al
DEERE & COMPANY European Office Patent Department
68140 Mannheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [1993/01]Feldmann, Bernhard, et al
DEERE & COMPANY European Office Patent Department
D-68140 Mannheim / DE
Application number, filing date92108378.818.05.1992
[1993/01]
Priority number, dateUS1991069876210.05.1991         Original published format: US 698762
[1993/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0521280
Date:07.01.1993
Language:DE
[1993/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0521280
Date:02.06.1993
Language:DE
[1993/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0521280
Date:09.08.1995
Language:DE
[1995/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.04.1993
ClassificationIPC:A01F12/44, A01D41/12
[1993/22]
CPC:
A01F12/442 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1993/01]A01F12/44
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1993/01]
TitleGerman:Axialabscheider[1993/01]
English:Axial separator[1993/01]
French:Séparateur axial[1993/01]
Examination procedure04.06.1993Examination requested  [1993/31]
24.05.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.09.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.01.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.02.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.04.1995Fee for grant paid
11.04.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.05.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1996/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
20.05.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]GB1292677  (SPERRY RAND CORP [US]);
 [AD]US4254780  (POWELL THOMAS E, et al);
 [A]US4711253  (ANDERSON JOSEPH A [US]);
 [A]DE2234567  (TENKHOFF JOSEF);
 [A]EP0224750  (BISO BITTER GMBH & CO KG [DE]);
 [A]US2969862  (WORRELL ROBERT L)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.