Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0517247

EP0517247 - Multilayer package [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.06.2002
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.08.2002  [2002/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/34]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP
Former [1995/01]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP
Former [1992/50]For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
72, Horikawa-cho Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hirano, Naohiko, c/o Intellectual Property Div.
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP
[1992/50]
Representative(s)Lehn, Werner , et al
Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20
81904 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/50]Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20
D-81904 München / DE
Application number, filing date92109550.105.06.1992
[1992/50]
Priority number, dateJP1991013461306.06.1991         Original published format: JP 13461391
JP1992013900629.05.1992         Original published format: JP 13900692
[1992/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0517247
Date:09.12.1992
Language:EN
[1992/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0517247
Date:16.02.1994
Language:EN
[1994/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0517247
Date:22.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.12.1993
ClassificationInternational:H01L23/498
[1992/50]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1992/50]
TitleGerman:Mehrschichtpackung[1992/50]
English:Multilayer package[1992/50]
French:Empaquetage multi-couche[1992/50]
Examination procedure05.06.1992Examination requested  [1992/50]
11.01.1994New documents discovered [1994/09]
07.10.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.04.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.03.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.10.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.10.1999Date of oral proceedings
08.11.1999Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
21.08.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.11.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.02.2001Fee for grant paid
07.02.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.05.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.06.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
01.05.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
10.06.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
10.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
15.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
14.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 09
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0275973  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 10, line 43 - column 12, line 17; figure 3 *;
 [A]WO8701510  (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [A] 1 * page 7, line 22 - page 9, line 7 * * page 11, line 13 - line 29 *;
 [A]US4972253  (PALINO DOUGLAS F [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 36 - column 7, line 62; figures 4-9 *;
 [A]JPS62216240  ;
 [A]US4949453  (NEUMANN EUGENE F [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 17 - column 3, line 4; figures 1,2 * * column 4, line 3 - line 10 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880310), vol. 12, no. 77, Database accession no. (E - 589), & JP62216240 A 00000000 (NEC IC MICROCOMPUTER SYSTEMS LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *