Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0520350

EP0520350 - Synchronized apparatus and process for cutting windows through tapes and applying labels onto said windows [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.04.1994
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.1994Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.06.1994 [1994/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MECCANICA ROBECCHESE sas
Via Sangiorgio Abbondio
I-20145 Milano (MI) / IT
[1993/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Politi, Pietro, c/o Meccanica Robecchese sas
Via Sangiorgio Abbondio
I-20145 Milano, MI / IT
02 / Poggi, Carlo, c/o Meccanica Robecchese sas
Via Sangiorgio Abbondio
I-20145 Milano, MI / IT
[1993/01]
Representative(s)Trupiano, Roberto
BREVETTI EUROPA S.r.l. Corso di Porta Ticinese, 3
20123 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [1993/01]Trupiano, Roberto
BREVETTI EUROPA S.r.l. Piazza Bernini, 6
I-20133 Milano (MI) / IT
Application number, filing date92110464.221.06.1992
[1993/01]
Priority number, dateIT1991MI0177127.06.1991         Original published format: IT MI911771
IT1992MI0135302.06.1992         Original published format: IT MI921353
[1993/01]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0520350
Date:30.12.1992
Language:EN
[1992/53]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.10.1992
ClassificationInternational:B31B1/24, B31B1/82, B32B31/08
[1993/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   LI,   SE [1993/01]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum synchronisierten Schneiden von Fenstern aus Materialbahnen und Aufkleben von Etiketten auf diese Fenster[1993/01]
English:Synchronized apparatus and process for cutting windows through tapes and applying labels onto said windows[1993/01]
French:Procédé et dispositif synchronisés pour le découpage de fenêtre dans des bandes continues, et pour l'application d'étiquettes sur les dites fenêtres[1993/01]
File destroyed:31.08.2001
Examination procedure01.07.1993Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1994/24]
20.12.1993Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [1994/24]
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0117623  (COORS CO ADOLPH [US]);
 [A]EP0264940  (KECK JUERGEN K);
 [A]US3957570  (HELM HERBERT W);
 [A]US2734431  ;
 [A]US4413984  (ALTER SEYMOUR S [US]);
 [A]EP0419773  (LANDIS & GYR BETRIEBS AG [CH])
 [A]  - MACHINE DESIGN vol. 57, no. 19, August 1985, CLEVELAND, OHIOUSA pages 66 - 71 C WALL 'THE MOVE TO ELECTRONICS'