Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0541899

EP0541899 - Data transmitting apparatus and code transmission system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 09.01.2008  [2008/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1993/20]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kimura, Tomohiro, Mitsubishi Denki K.K.
Tsushin System Kenkyusho, of 5-1-1, Ofuna
Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa / JP
02 / Ono, Fumitaka, Mitsubishi Denki K.K.
Tsushin System Kenkyusho, of 5-1-1, Ofuna
Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa / JP
03 / Yoshida, Masayuki, Mitsubishi Denki K.K.
Tsushin System Kenkyusho, of 5-1-1, Ofuna
Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa / JP
04 / Kino, Shigenori, Mitsubishi Denki K.K.
Tsushin System Kenkyusho, of 5-1-1, Ofuna
Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa / JP
[1993/20]
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 11a
80339 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1993/20]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner
Mozartstrasse 17
D-80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date92110597.924.06.1992
[1993/20]
Priority number, dateJP1991030048615.11.1991         Original published format: JP 30048691
[1993/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0541899
Date:19.05.1993
Language:EN
[1993/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0541899
Date:17.08.1994
Language:EN
[1994/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0541899
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.06.1994
ClassificationInternational:H03M7/40
[1993/20]
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IT [1993/20]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Datenübertragung und System zur Codeübertragung[1993/20]
English:Data transmitting apparatus and code transmission system[1993/20]
French:Dispositif de transmission de données et système de transmission de code[1993/20]
Examination procedure15.09.1994Examination requested  [1994/46]
09.09.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.03.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.10.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.03.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.10.1999Fee for grant paid
12.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
24.06.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
24.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
23.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
15.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT26.01.2000
DK26.04.2000
[2008/02]
Former [2003/45]DK26.04.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0443255  (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *