EP0580879 - Process for increasing the dimensional and spinning stability of capillar hollow membranes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.1997 Database last updated on 22.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sächsische Kunstseiden GmbH Heidenauer Strasse 1 01796 Pirna / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/05] | For all designated states Sächsische Kunstseiden GmbH Heidenauer Strasse 1 D-01796 Pirna / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gensrich, Heinz-Jürgen Dr. DC Stormstr. 6 D-14513 Teltow / DE | 02 /
Bossin, Elke DC Phillipp-Müller-Allee 97 D-14532 Kleinmachnow / DE | 03 /
Brechling, Christa DC Prof.-Rossmässler-Str. 36 D-01796 Pirna / DE | 04 /
Gröbe, Volker Prof. Dr. DC Hauffstr. 38 - 40 D-14513 Teltow / DE | 05 /
Hartwig, Stephan Dr. DC Kleine Mühlenbreite 30 D-39240 Calbe/Saale / DE | 06 /
Holtz, Manfred Doz. Dr. DC Brahestr. 3 D-18059 Rostock / DE | 07 /
Klünder, Lisa DC Zehistaer Str. 55 D-01796 Pirna / DE | 08 /
Müller, Klaus Dr. DC Kohlbergstr. 22 D-01796 Pirna / DE | 09 /
Nestler, Lothar DC Gartenweg 8 D-01723 Kesselsdorf / DE | 10 /
Paul, Dieter Prof. Dr. DC Wolfswerder 25 D-14532 Kleinmachnow / DE | 11 /
Vogel, Dieter Borsbergblick 9 D-01796 Pirna / DE | [1996/16] |
Former [1995/35] | 01 /
Gensrich, Heinz-Jürgen Dr. DC Stormstr. 6 D-14513 Teltow / DE | ||
02 /
Bossin, Elke DC Phillipp-Müller-Allee 97 D-14532 Kleinmachnow / DE | |||
03 /
Brechling, Christa DC Prof.-Rossmässler-Str. 36 D-01796 Pirna / DE | |||
04 /
Gröbe, Volker Prof. Dr. DC Hauffstr. 38 - 40 D-14513 Teltow / DE | |||
05 /
Hartwig, Stephan Dr. DC Kleine Mühlenbreite 30 D-39240 Calbe/Saale / DE | |||
06 /
Holtz, Manfred Doz. Dr. DC Brahestr. 3 D-18059 Rostock / DE | |||
07 /
Klünder, Lisa DC Zehistaer Str. 55 D-01796 Pirna / DE | |||
08 /
Müller, Klaus Dr. DC Kohlbergstr. 22 D-01796Pirna / DE | |||
09 /
Nestler, Lothar DC Gartenweg 8 D-01723 Kesselsdorf / DE | |||
10 /
Paul, Dieter Prof. Dr. DC Wolfswerder 25 D-14532 Kleinmachnow / DE | |||
11 /
Vogel, Dieter Borsbergblick 9 D-01796 Pirna / DE | |||
Former [1995/33] | 01 /
Gensrich, Heinz-Jürgen Dr. DC Stormstr. 6 D-14513 Teltow / DE | ||
02 /
Hartwig, Stephan Dr. DC Kleine Mühlenbreite 30 D-39240 Calbe/Saale / DE | |||
03 /
Müller, Klaus Dr. DC Kohlbergstr. 22 D-01796 Pirna / DE | |||
04 /
Bossin, Elke, DC Phillipp-Müller-Allee 97 D-14532 Kleinmachnow / DE | |||
05 /
Paul, Dieter Prof.Dr.DC Wolfswerder 25 D-14532 Kleinmachnow / DE | |||
06 /
Gröbe, Volker, Prof. Dr. DC Hauffstr. 38 - 40 D-14513 Teltow / DE | |||
07 /
Holtz, Manfred Dr. DC Brahestr. 3 D-18059 Rostock / DE | |||
08 /
Brechling, Christa DC Prof.-Rossmässler-Str. 36 D-01796 Pirna / DE | |||
09 /
Klünder, Lisa DC Zehistaerstr. 55 D-01796 Pirna / DE | |||
10 /
Nestler, Lothar DC Gartenweg 8 D-01723 Kesselsdorf / DE | |||
11 /
* * * | |||
12 /
Vogel, Dieter DC Borsbergblick 9 D-01796 Pirna / DE | |||
Former [1995/28] | 01 /
Gensrich, Heinz-Jürgen Dr. DC Stromstr. 6 D-14513 Teltow / DE | ||
02 /
Hartwig, Stephan Dr. DC Robert-Koch-Str. 27 D-07407 Rudolstadt-Schwarza / DE | |||
03 /
Müller, Klaus Dr. DC Kohlberg 22 D-01796 Pirna / DE | |||
04 /
Bossin, Elke, DC Phillipp-Müller-Allee 97 D-14532 Kleinmachnow / DE | |||
05 /
Paul, Dieter Prof.Dr.DC Wolfwerder 25 D-14532 Kleinmachnow / DE | |||
06 /
Gröbe, Volker, Prof. Dr. DC Hauffstr. 38 - 40 D-14513 Teltow / DE | |||
07 /
Holtz, Manfred Dr. DC Bruno-Schmidt-Str. 3 D-18055 Rostock / DE | |||
08 /
Brechling, Christa DC Prof.-Rossmässler-Str. 36 D-01796 Pirna / DE | |||
09 /
Klünder, Lisa DC Zehistaerstr. 55 D-01796 Pirna / DE | |||
10 /
Nestler, Lothar DC Gartenweg 8 D-01723 Kesselsdorf / DE | |||
11 /
* * * | |||
12 /
Vogel, Dieter DC Borsbergblick 9 D-01796 Pirna / DE | |||
Former [1995/27] | 01 /
Gensrich, Heinz-Jürgen Dr. DC Stromstr. 6 D-14513 Teltow / DE | ||
02 /
Hartwig, Stephan Dr. DC Robert-Koch-Str. 27 D-07407 Rudolstadt-Schwarza / DE | |||
03 /
Müller, Klaus Dr. DC Kohlberg 22 D-01796 Pirna / DE | |||
04 /
Bossin, Elke, DC Phillipp-Müller-Allee 97 D-14532 Kleinmachnow / DE | |||
05 /
Paul, Dieter Prof.Dr.DC Wolfwerder 25 D-14532 Kleinmachnow / DE | |||
06 /
Gröbe, Volker, Prof. Dr. DC Hauffstr. 38 - 40 D-14513 Teltow / DE | |||
07 /
* * * | |||
08 /
* * * | |||
09 /
Holtz, Manfred Dr. DC Bahestr. 3 D-18059 Rostock / DE | |||
10 /
Brechling, Christa DC Prof.-Rossmässler-Str.36 D-01796 Pirna / DE | |||
11 /
Klünder, Lisa, DC Zehistaerstr. 55 D-01796 Pirna / DE | |||
12 /
Nestler, Lothar, DC Gartenweg 8 D-01723 Kesselsdorf / DE | |||
13 /
Vogel, Dieter, DC Borsbergblick 9 D-01796 Pirna / DE | |||
Former [1994/05] | 01 /
Gensrich, Heinz-Jurgen Dr. DC Stromstr. 6 D-14513 Teltow / DE | ||
02 /
Hartwig, Stephan Dr. DC Robert-Koch-Str. 27 D-07407 Rudolstadt-Schwarza / DE | |||
03 /
M ller, Klaus Dr. DC Kohlberg 22 D-01796 Pirna / DE | |||
04 /
Philipp, Burkhart Prof.Dr.DC Hauffstr. 23 D-14513 Teltow-Seehof / DE | |||
05 /
Paul, Dieter Prof.Dr.DC Wolfwerder 25 D-14532 Kleinmachnow / DE | |||
06 /
Fink, Hans-Peter Dr.habil Kiefernweg 25 D-14513 Teltow / DE | |||
07 /
Weigel, Peter Dr.DPhys Werner-Seelenbinder-Str. 3b D-14532 Kleinmachnow / DE | |||
08 /
Kunze, J rgen Dr. DC Goethestr. 14 D-14532 Kleinmachnow / DE | |||
09 /
Holtz, Manfred Dr. DC Bruno-Schmidt-Str. 3 D-18055 Rostock / DE | |||
10 /
Brechling, Dhrista DC Prof.-Rossm ssler-Str. 4 D-01796 Pirna / DE | |||
11 /
Kl nder, Lisa DC Zehistaerstr. 55 D-01796 Pirna / DE | |||
12 /
Nestler, Lothar DC Gartenweg 8 D-01723 Kesselsdorf / DE | |||
13 /
Vogel, Dieter DC Borsbergblick 9 D-01796 Pirna / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1996/33] |
Former [1994/05] | Rauschenbach, Marion, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwältin Sadisdorfer Weg 2 a D-01189 Dresden / DE | Application number, filing date | 92110727.2 | 25.06.1992 | [1994/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0580879 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0580879 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B01D69/08, B01D71/10 | [1994/05] | CPC: |
D01F2/06 (EP);
B01D67/0011 (EP,US);
B01D69/08 (EP);
B01D71/10 (EP);
D01D5/24 (EP);
B01D2323/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, ES, FR, IT [1994/22] |
Former [1994/05] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erhöhung der Form- und Spinnstabilität von Kapillarhohlmembranen | [1994/05] | English: | Process for increasing the dimensional and spinning stability of capillar hollow membranes | [1994/05] | French: | Procédé d'augmentation de la stabilité dimensionnelle et au filage de membranes capillaires creuses | [1994/05] | Examination procedure | 28.06.1993 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, DE, DK, GB, GR, LI, LU, MC, NL | 01.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/39] | 24.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.07.1993 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.1993 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.1993 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.1993 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.1993 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.1993 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.1993 | LI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.1993 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.1993 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.1993 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.1993 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.1993 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 17.04.1996 | FR | 17.04.1996 | IT | 17.04.1996 | AT | 25.06.1996 | [2004/35] |
Former [2002/25] | ES | 17.04.1996 | |
IT | 17.04.1996 | ||
AT | 25.06.1996 | ||
FR | 13.09.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 17.04.1996 | |
AT | 25.06.1996 | ||
FR | 13.09.1996 | ||
Former [1998/02] | AT | 25.06.1996 | |
FR | 13.09.1996 | ||
Former [1997/14] | FR | 13.09.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2026714 (COURTAULDS LTD); | [A]EP0008536 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]); | [A]GB2065546 (CORDIS DOW CORP); | [A]EP0128325 (HOECHST AG [DE]) |