blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0528173

EP0528173 - Sensor controlled cleaning-start for a pyrolytic oven [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.01.1996
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip03.01.1996No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.01.1996 [1996/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bosch-Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH
Hochstrasse 17
81669 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1993/08]For all designated states
BOSCH-SIEMENS HAUSGERÄTE GmbH
Hochstrasse 17
D-81669 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Waigand, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing.
Traunstrasse 18d
W-8221 St. Georgen / DE
02 / Wallner, Gottfried, Dipl.-Ing.
Seefischerwerk
W-8221 Tengling / DE
[1993/08]
Application number, filing date92111995.414.07.1992
[1993/08]
Priority number, dateDE1991412738819.08.1991         Original published format: DE 4127388
[1993/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0528173
Date:24.02.1993
Language:DE
[1993/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0528173
Date:01.02.1995
Language:DE
[1995/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.12.1992
ClassificationIPC:F24C7/00
[1993/08]
CPC:
F24C14/02 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1993/08]
TitleGerman:Herd mit sensorgesteuertem Pyrolysestart[1993/08]
English:Sensor controlled cleaning-start for a pyrolytic oven[1993/08]
French:Four à démarrage de nettoyage par pyrolyse commandé par un capteur[1993/08]
Examination procedure29.07.1993Examination requested  [1993/38]
02.05.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.08.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.10.1994Fee for grant paid
13.10.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.11.1995No opposition filed within time limit [1996/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.07.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US4481404  (THOMAS CHARLES E [US], et al);
 [A]EP0380733  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]);
 [AP]EP0459131  (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]);
 [AP]DE9112786U
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.