blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0528177

EP0528177 - Internal fixator for the correction of a lumbar spondyldisthesis [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.07.1997
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.1997No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.09.1997 [1997/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AESCULAP AG
Postfach 40
D-78501 Tuttlingen / DE
[1993/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Blömer, Wilhelm
Duttentalstr. 33/1
W-7200 Tuttlingen / DE
02 / Braun, Karl
Oberer Brühl 305
W-7201 Talheim / DE
[1993/08]
Representative(s)Boehme, Ulrich, et al
HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Uhlandstrasse 14 c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1993/08]Böhme, Ulrich Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner, et al
Uhlandstrasse 14c
D-70182 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date92112132.316.07.1992
[1993/08]
Priority number, dateDE1991412730317.08.1991         Original published format: DE 4127303
[1993/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0528177
Date:24.02.1993
Language:DE
[1993/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0528177
Date:05.05.1993
Language:DE
[1993/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0528177
Date:11.09.1996
Language:DE
[1996/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.03.1993
ClassificationIPC:A61B17/58
[1993/08]
CPC:
A61B17/708 (EP)
Designated contracting statesCH,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1996/13]
Former [1993/08]CH,  DE,  FR,  GB,  IT,  LI 
TitleGerman:Fixateur interne zur Reposition einer lumbalen Spondylolisthesis[1993/08]
English:Internal fixator for the correction of a lumbar spondyldisthesis[1993/08]
French:Fixateur externe pour la correction d'une spondylolisthésis lombaire[1993/08]
Examination procedure19.05.1993Examination requested  [1993/28]
18.05.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.09.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.11.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.02.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.05.1996Fee for grant paid
02.05.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.06.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1997/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.07.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
21.06.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
09.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9002527  (AUSTRALIAN DEFENCE IND PTY LTD [AU]);
 [A]US1920821  (STEPHANUS WASSENAAR JAN JACOB);
 [XP]DE9110203U
 [A]  - UNFALLCHIRURGIE Bd. 12, Nr. 2, 1986, Seiten 68 - 79 P.KLUGER UND H.J.GERNER 'Das mechanische Prinzip des Fixateur externe zur dorsalen Stabilisierung der Brust- und Lendenwirbels{ule'
by applicantDE3625542
 WO9002527
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.