Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0524587 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0524587



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 269
08.10.1996 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
19.10.1995 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
26.06.1995 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
26.06.1995 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
26.06.1995 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 3
26.06.1995 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
26.06.1995 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
26.06.1995 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
26.06.1995 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
04.04.1995 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
30.03.1995 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
27.03.1995 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
02.12.1994 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
02.12.1994 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 3
02.12.1994 Text intended for grant Search / examination 40
02.02.1994 Claims Search / examination 2
02.02.1994 Claims Search / examination 3
02.02.1994 Description Search / examination 1
02.02.1994 Description Search / examination 10
02.02.1994 Description Search / examination 1
02.02.1994 Drawings Search / examination 2
02.02.1994 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 7
02.02.1994 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 10
30.09.1993 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
29.07.1993 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
19.11.1992 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
19.11.1992 Priority document Search / examination 39
19.11.1992 Translation of priority document Search / examination 54
12.11.1992 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
12.11.1992 European search report Search / examination 2
01.10.1992 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
01.10.1992 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
29.09.1992 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
07.09.1992 Invitation to pay claims fees Search / examination 2
17.08.1992 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
15.08.1992 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
15.08.1992 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
20.07.1992 Authorisation Search / examination 1
20.07.1992 Claims Search / examination 2
20.07.1992 Claims Search / examination 3
20.07.1992 Description Search / examination 27
20.07.1992 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
20.07.1992 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
20.07.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 9
20.07.1992 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
20.07.1992 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5