blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0528288

EP0528288 - Process for producing curved graphite articles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.03.1998
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip20.03.1998No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.05.1998 [1998/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1994/50]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Ohaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP
Former [1993/08]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD
1006-banchi, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Murakami, Matsuaki
18-23, Miwa Midoriyama 1-chome
Machida-shi, Tokyo / JP
02 / Yoshimura, Susumu
529-18, Kamoshida-cho, Midori-ku
Yokohama / JP
03 / Nishiki, Naomi
20-44, Daigo Minamihayama-cho
Fushimi-ku, Kyoto / JP
04 / Nakamura, Katsuyuki
22-7, Kourinishino-cho
Neyagawa-shi, Osaka / JP
05 / Watanabe, Kazuhiro
3-33-17, Sugao, Miyamae-ku
Kawasaki / JP
[1993/08]
Representative(s)Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1993/08]Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
D-80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date92113470.619.09.1989
[1993/08]
Priority number, dateJP1988023521920.09.1988         Original published format: JP 23521988
JP1988023521820.09.1988         Original published format: JP 23521888
JP1988023521720.09.1988         Original published format: JP 23521788
[1993/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0528288
Date:24.02.1993
Language:EN
[1993/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0528288
Date:02.06.1993
Language:EN
[1993/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0528288
Date:14.05.1997
Language:EN
[1997/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.04.1993
ClassificationIPC:C04B35/52
[1997/20]
CPC:
C04B35/524 (EP,US); Y10T156/1048 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1993/08]C04B35/54
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1993/08]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung gebogener Graphitgegenstände[1993/08]
English:Process for producing curved graphite articles[1993/08]
French:Procédé de préparation de pièces de graphite courbes[1993/08]
Examination procedure18.05.1993Examination requested  [1993/29]
12.04.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.10.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.08.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.12.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.04.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.07.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.11.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.02.1997Fee for grant paid
06.02.1997Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP89117296.7  / EP0360217
Opposition(s)17.02.1998No opposition filed within time limit [1998/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.08.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
21.08.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
28.09.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
26.09.1994Renewal fee patent year 06
27.09.1995Renewal fee patent year 07
27.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]JP63081300  ;
 [A]JP52045091  ;
 [Y]EP0203581  (JAPAN RES DEV CORP [JP], et al);
 [AD]EP0205970  (JAPAN RES DEV CORP [JP], et al)
 [Y]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 109, no. 18, 1988, page 799, abstract no. 161147n, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-63 081 300 (K. HIRAI et al.) 12-04-1988, & JP63081300 A 00000000
 [A]  - WORLD PATENT INDEX DATABASE, accession no. 77-35515Y, week 20, Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; & JP-A-52 045 091 (NIHON KOKUEN KOGYO) 08-04-1977, & JP52045091 A 00000000
ExaminationEP0305197
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.