blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0528299

EP0528299 - Method of recovery of polyisocyanates from distillation residues of tolueredi-isocyanate preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.11.1995
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip11.11.1995No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.01.1996 [1996/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BAYER AG
51368 Leverkusen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1993/08]For all designated states
BAYER AG
D-51368 Leverkusen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Zarnack, Uwe Jens, Dr.
Ulitzhörn 2
W-2212 Brunsbüttel / DE
02 / Weintritt, Volker, Dr.
Allee 20
W-2222 Marne / DE
03 / König, Christian, Dr.
Pillauer Weg 11
W-4044 Kaarst 1 / DE
[1993/08]
Application number, filing date92113506.707.08.1992
[1993/08]
Priority number, dateDE1991412751420.08.1991         Original published format: DE 4127514
[1993/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0528299
Date:24.02.1993
Language:DE
[1993/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0528299
Date:05.05.1993
Language:DE
[1993/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0528299
Date:11.01.1995
Language:DE
[1995/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.03.1993
ClassificationIPC:C07C263/20
[1993/08]
CPC:
C07C263/20 (EP,US); Y10S203/06 (EP,US); Y10S203/17 (EP,US)
C-Set:
C07C263/20, C07C265/14 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   IT [1993/08]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Gewinnung von Polyisocyanaten aus Destillationsrückständen der Toluylendiisocyanatherstellung[1993/08]
English:Method of recovery of polyisocyanates from distillation residues of tolueredi-isocyanate preparation[1993/08]
French:Procédé pour l'extraction de polyisocyanates des résidus de distillation de la préparation de toluèrediisocyanate[1993/08]
Examination procedure19.05.1993Examination requested  [1993/28]
19.10.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.01.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.06.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.08.1994Fee for grant paid
11.08.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.10.1995No opposition filed within time limit [1996/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.07.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]DD257827  ;
 [A]EP0269218  (NOBEL CHEMATUR AB [SE]);
 [AD]FR2320938  (SCHWARZHEIDE SYNTHESEWERK VEB [DD]);
 [AD]EP0017972  (BASF AG [DE])
 [AD]  - DATABASE WPIL Week 8844, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 88-308139 & DD-A-257 827 (VEB SYNTHESEWERK SCHWARZHEIDE), & DD257827 A 00000000
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.