blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0531736

EP0531736 - Process and apparatus for monitoring supersaturation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.12.1997
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip24.12.1997No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.02.1998 [1998/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
[N/P]
Former [1993/11]For all designated states
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Lin, Ming-Jye, c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester New York 14650-2201 / US
02 / Wey, Jong-Shinn, c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester New York 14650-2201 / US
[1993/11]
Representative(s)Brandes, Jürgen, et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1993/11]Brandes, Jürgen, Dr. rer. nat., et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date92113805.313.08.1992
[1993/11]
Priority number, dateUS1991074566816.08.1991         Original published format: US 745668
[1993/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0531736
Date:17.03.1993
Language:EN
[1993/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0531736
Date:26.02.1997
Language:EN
[1997/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.01.1993
ClassificationIPC:G03C1/015
[1993/11]
CPC:
G03C1/015 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1996/41]
Former [1993/11]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Überwachung einer Übersättigung[1993/11]
English:Process and apparatus for monitoring supersaturation[1993/11]
French:Procédé et dispositif de surveillance d'une super saturation[1993/11]
Examination procedure08.09.1993Examination requested  [1993/44]
26.02.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.06.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.07.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.08.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.11.1996Fee for grant paid
22.11.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.11.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1998/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.08.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
25.08.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
05.08.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]EP0356342  (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]);
 [A]US4157289  (IKENOUE SHINPEI [JP], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.