blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0532922

EP0532922 - Yarn feeding device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.02.1997
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip28.02.1997No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.04.1997 [1997/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
H. Stoll GmbH & Co.
Stollweg 1
72760 Reutlingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1993/12]For all designated states
H. Stoll GmbH & Co.
Stollweg 1
D-72760 Reutlingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Schmid, Franz
Eichenweg 20
W-7454 Bodelshausen / DE
02 / Walker, Fritz
Lange Gasse 32
W-7408 Kusterdingen / DE
[1993/12]
Representative(s)Möbus, Rudolf
Hindenburgstrasse 65
72762 Reutlingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1993/12]Möbus, Rudolf, Dipl.-Ing.
Hindenburgstrasse 65
D-72762 Reutlingen / DE
Application number, filing date92114043.018.08.1992
[1993/12]
Priority number, dateDE1991413132220.09.1991         Original published format: DE 4131322
[1993/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0532922
Date:24.03.1993
Language:DE
[1993/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0532922
Date:17.04.1996
Language:DE
[1996/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.01.1993
ClassificationIPC:B65H51/12
[1993/12]
CPC:
D04B15/52 (EP,US); B65H51/12 (EP,US); B65H2701/31 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1993/12]
TitleGerman:Fadenliefervorrichtung[1993/12]
English:Yarn feeding device[1993/12]
French:Dispositif fournisseur de fil[1993/12]
Examination procedure26.08.1993Examination requested  [1993/42]
31.10.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.02.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.07.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.10.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.12.1995Fee for grant paid
20.12.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.01.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1997/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.07.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
28.07.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[YD]EP0387546  (SOBREVIN [LI]);
 [Y]GB951728  (SPINNER OY);
 [AD]FR2071546  (VERDOL MECANIQUES);
 [A]BE484053
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.