blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0530793

EP0530793 - White balance control circuit in an image pickup apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.10.1999
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip22.10.1999No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.12.1999 [1999/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1993/10]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Takei, Hirofumi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP
[1993/10]
Representative(s)Tiedtke, Harro, et al
Patentanwaltsbüro
Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner
Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1993/10]Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
D-80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date92115060.303.09.1992
[1993/10]
Priority number, dateJP1991022556705.09.1991         Original published format: JP 22556791
JP1991023968319.09.1991         Original published format: JP 23968391
[1993/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0530793
Date:10.03.1993
Language:EN
[1993/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0530793
Date:18.08.1993
Language:EN
[1993/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0530793
Date:16.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.06.1993
ClassificationIPC:H04N9/73
[1993/10]
CPC:
H04N23/88 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1993/10]
TitleGerman:Weissabgleichssteuerung für eine Bildaufnahmevorrichtung[1993/10]
English:White balance control circuit in an image pickup apparatus[1993/10]
French:Circuit de réglage de l'équilibre des blancs pour un dispositif de prise d'images[1993/10]
Examination procedure04.01.1994Examination requested  [1994/10]
20.12.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.04.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.12.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.02.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.08.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.12.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.03.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.06.1998Fee for grant paid
26.06.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.09.1999No opposition filed within time limit [1999/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
26.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
29.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0097032  (SONY CORP [JP]);
 [A]EP0224904  (HITACHI LTD [JP]);
 [A]US4797733  (TAKAGI YASUSHI [JP], et al);
 [A]US4922330  (SAITO KENJI [JP], et al);
 [A]EP0429992  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]);
 [A]EP0442269  (HITACHI LTD [JP])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.