blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0531964

EP0531964 - Divisible tablet [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  20.01.2006
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd.
1-1, Doshomachi, 4-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka 541 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1993/11]For all designated states
TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.
1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome
Chuo-ku, Osaka 541 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Makino, Tadashi
39-1, 12 Misimaoka 2-chome
Ibaraki-ku, Osaka 567 / JP
02 / Mizukami, Yoshio
1-917, 12 Isoji 2-chome, Minato-ku
Osaka 552 / JP
03 / Hirai, Shin-ichiro, 201, Tamamoto-cho
Aburakojidori-shomensagaru, Shimogyo-ku
Kyoto 600 / JP
[1993/11]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [1993/11]von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al
Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41
D-50462 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date92115410.009.09.1992
[1993/11]
Priority number, dateJP19910081382U10.09.1991         Original published format: JP 8138291 U
[1993/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0531964
Date:17.03.1993
Language:EN
[1993/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0531964
Date:24.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.12.1992
ClassificationIPC:A61K9/20
[1993/11]
CPC:
A61K9/2072 (EP,US); A61J3/06 (KR); A61J3/10 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1993/11]
TitleGerman:Teilbare Tablette[1993/11]
English:Divisible tablet[1993/11]
French:Pastille sécable[1993/11]
Examination procedure01.07.1993Examination requested  [1993/35]
05.10.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.04.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.11.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.03.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.07.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.03.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.06.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.04.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.08.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.10.1998Fee for grant paid
22.10.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.11.1999  06.12.1999  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
-Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Richter, Joachim
RGTH
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Neuer Wall 10
20354 Hamburg / DE
 02  24.11.1999  10.12.1999  ADMISSIBLE
Desitin Arzneimittel GmbH
Weg beim Jäger 214
22335 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Both, Georg
Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/31]
Opponent(s)01  24.11.1999  06.12.1999  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
-Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Richter, Joachim
Richter, Werdermann, Gerbaulet & Hofmann Neuer Wall 10
20354 Hamburg / DE
 02  24.11.1999  10.12.1999  ADMISSIBLE
Desitin Arzneimittel GmbH
Weg beim Jäger 214
22335 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Both, Georg
Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4
D-22607 Hamburg / DE
Former [2002/13]
Opponent(s)01  24.11.1999  06.12.1999  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Patente, Marken und Lizenzen
D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Richter, Joachim, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Richter, Werdermann & Gerbaulet Neuer Wall 10
20354 Hamburg / DE
 02  24.11.1999  10.12.1999  ADMISSIBLE
Desitin Arzneimittel GmbH
Weg beim Jäger 214
22335 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Both, Georg
Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4
D-22607 Hamburg / DE
Former [2000/03]
Opponent(s)01  24.11.1999  06.12.1999  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Patente, Marken und Lizenzen
D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
 02  24.11.1999  10.12.1999  ADMISSIBLE
Desitin Arzneimittel GmbH
Weg beim Jäger 214
22335 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Both, Georg
Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4
D-22607 Hamburg / DE
Former [2000/02]
Opponent(s)01  24.11.1999  06.12.1999  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Patente, Marken und Lizenzen
D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
27.12.1999Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.08.2000Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.08.2000Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M08)
20.04.2001Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
12.03.2002Date of oral proceedings
24.04.2002Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
24.04.2002Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
27.09.2005Legal effect of revocation of patent [2006/10]
27.09.2005Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition20.06.2002Appeal received No.  T0662/02
23.08.2002Statement of grounds filed
27.09.2005Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
27.09.2005Date of oral proceedings
05.10.2005Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
28.09.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
26.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
26.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4258027  (ULLMAN MICHAEL K, et al);
 [X]EP0239983  (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM KG [DE], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.