blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0532011

EP0532011 - Pack seal [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.02.1997
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip07.02.1997No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.03.1997 [1997/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Uchiyama Manufacturing corp.
338 Enami Okayama-shi
Okayama-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [1996/14]For all designated states
UCHIYAMA MANUFACTURING CORP.
338 Enami
Okayama-shi, Okayama-ken / JP
Former [1993/11]For all designated states
Uchiyama Manufacturing corp.
No. 338 Enami
Okayama-City Okayama Prefecture / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nakano, Youji, c/o Uchiyama Manufacturing Corp.
338, Enami
Okayama-shi, Okayama-ken / JP
[1993/11]
Representative(s)Perani, Aurelio, et al
c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A Via Senato 8
20121 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [1995/32]Perani, Aurelio, et al
c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A Via Visconti di Modrone, 7
I-20122 Milano / IT
Former [1993/11]Perani, Aurelio
c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Via Visconti di Modrone, 7
I-20122 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date92115528.910.09.1992
[1993/11]
Priority number, dateJP1991009686012.09.1991         Original published format: JP 9686091
[1993/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0532011
Date:17.03.1993
Language:EN
[1993/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0532011
Date:03.04.1996
Language:EN
[1996/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.1992
ClassificationIPC:F16J15/32
[1993/11]
CPC:
F16C33/7883 (EP); F16C41/007 (EP); F16J15/326 (EP);
F16J15/3264 (EP); G01P3/443 (EP); F16C19/184 (EP);
F16C2326/02 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1993/11]
TitleGerman:Kassettendichtung[1993/11]
English:Pack seal[1993/11]
French:Joint d'étanchéité en cartouche[1993/11]
Examination procedure19.07.1993Examination requested  [1993/38]
12.09.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.12.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.06.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.08.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.12.1995Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
17.01.1996Fee for grant paid
17.01.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.01.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1997/13]
Request for further processing for:16.01.1996Request for further processing filed
17.01.1996Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
08.02.1996Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.08.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]WO8700290  (SAAB SCANIA AB [SE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.