Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0532050 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0532050



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 234
04.04.2002 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
12.04.2001 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
21.03.2001 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
21.03.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
21.03.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
16.01.2001 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
19.12.2000 Description Search / examination 1
19.12.2000 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
19.09.2000 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
19.09.2000 Text intended for grant Search / examination 30
04.09.2000 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 3
02.08.2000 General enquiry Search / examination 1
24.02.2000 Request for change of address of the applicant Search / examination 1
26.01.2000 Abstract Search / examination 1
26.01.2000 Claims Search / examination 3
26.01.2000 Description Search / examination 3
26.01.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.11.1999 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
13.09.1999 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.09.1999 General enquiry Search / examination 1
02.09.1999 General enquiry Search / examination 1
24.02.1999 Claims Search / examination 3
24.02.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.02.1999 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
01.02.1999 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.01.1999 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.09.1998 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
18.08.1998 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.07.1998 General enquiry Search / examination 1
28.07.1998 General enquiry Search / examination 1
16.03.1998 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
19.02.1998 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
12.12.1997 Claims Search / examination 3
12.12.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
12.12.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
12.12.1997 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
11.12.1997 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 9
14.10.1997 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
02.10.1997 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.06.1997 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
17.01.1997 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.12.1996 General enquiry Search / examination 2
21.10.1996 General enquiry Search / examination 1
05.09.1996 Invitation to file an authorisation Search / examination 1
02.09.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 2
02.09.1996 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
02.09.1996 Invitation to file an authorisation Search / examination 1
27.08.1996 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
22.08.1996 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
02.06.1993 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
02.06.1993 European search report Search / examination 3
30.11.1992 Drawings Search / examination 3
30.11.1992 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
30.11.1992 Priority document Search / examination 24
13.11.1992 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
21.09.1992 Deficiencies concerning the deposit of biological material Search / examination 2
18.09.1992 Abstract Search / examination 1
18.09.1992 Claims Search / examination 2
18.09.1992 Description Search / examination 13
18.09.1992 Drawings Search / examination 3
18.09.1992 Letter concerning biological material Search / examination 1
18.09.1992 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
14.09.1992 Abstract Search / examination 1
14.09.1992 Claims Search / examination 2
14.09.1992 Description Search / examination 13
14.09.1992 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
14.09.1992 Drawings Search / examination 3
14.09.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
14.09.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 16
14.09.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
14.09.1992 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6