Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0532050


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.04.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.06.2005  [2005/23]
26.12.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.02.2004  [2004/07]
05.12.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.01.2004  [2004/04]
19.09.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.11.2003  [2003/45]
11.10.2002 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.11.2002  [2002/48]
06.09.2002 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.10.2002  [2002/43]
03.05.2002 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.06.2002  [2002/25]
05.04.2002 No opposition filed within time limit published on  22.05.2002  [2002/21]
22.02.2002 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.04.2002  [2002/15]
15.02.2002 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.04.2002  [2002/14]
01.02.2002 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.03.2002  [2002/12]
14.12.2001 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.01.2002  [2002/05]
06.04.2001 (Expected) grant published on  23.05.2001 [2001/21]
29.03.2001 Communication of intention to grant a patent
11.01.2001 Communication of intention to grant
11.01.2001 Communication of intention to grant a patent
21.12.2000 Communication of intention to grant
14.09.2000 Communication of intention to grant
27.04.2000 Renewal fee
01.02.2000 Examination report or reply
24.11.1999 Examination report or reply
19.08.1999 Renewal fee
02.03.1999 Examination report or reply
01.02.1999 Examination report or reply
14.09.1998 Examination report or reply
16.07.1998 Renewal fee
13.03.1998 Change - representative published on  29.04.1998 [1998/18]
18.12.1997 Examination report or reply
10.10.1997 Examination report or reply
17.09.1997 Renewal fee
30.05.1997 First examination report
29.05.1997 Examination report or reply
31.08.1996 Renewal fee
30.08.1996 Change - representative published on  16.10.1996 [1996/42]
05.01.1994 Request for examination filed published on  23.02.1994 [1994/08]
02.06.1993 Publication of search report published on  21.07.1993 [1993/29]
20.04.1993 Change - classification published on  09.06.1993 [1993/23]
29.01.1993 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.03.1993 [1993/11]