Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0532050

EP0532050 - Mammalian artificial chromosomes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.04.2002
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.04.2005Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 08.06.2005  [2005/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BIOLOGICAL RESEARCH CENTER OF THE HUNGARIAN ACADEMY OF SCIENCES
P.O. Box 521
H-6701 Szeged / HU
[1993/11]
Inventor(s)01 / Hadlaczky, Gyula
Szamos u. 1/A IX.36
H-6723 Szeged / HU
[1993/11]
Representative(s)Baldock, Sharon Claire , et al
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/18]Baldock, Sharon Claire , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street
London EC4A 1PQ / GB
Former [1996/42]Goldin, Douglas Michael
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Former [1993/11]Dost, Wolfgang, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem.
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Postfach 86 06 20
D-81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date92115694.914.09.1992
[1993/11]
Priority number, dateUS1991075955813.09.1991         Original published format: US 759558
[1993/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0532050
Date:17.03.1993
Language:EN
[1993/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0532050
Date:21.07.1993
Language:EN
[1993/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0532050
Date:23.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.06.1993
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/85, C12N15/02, C12N5/10
[1993/23]
Former International [1993/11]C12N5/00, C12N15/02, C12N5/10
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1993/11]
TitleGerman:Künstliche-Säuger-Chromosome[1993/11]
English:Mammalian artificial chromosomes[1993/11]
French:Chromosomes artificiels de mammifères[1993/11]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Examination procedure21.12.1993Examination requested  [1994/08]
03.06.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.12.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.11.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.01.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.09.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
19.12.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
16.01.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.03.2001Fee for grant paid
21.03.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.02.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
22.08.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
10.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
06.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
09.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
17.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.05.2001
BE23.05.2001
CH23.05.2001
GR23.05.2001
LI23.05.2001
DK23.08.2001
PT23.08.2001
SE23.08.2001
IE14.09.2001
LU14.09.2001
MC14.09.2001
ES30.11.2001
[2005/23]
Former [2004/07]AT23.05.2001
BE23.05.2001
CH23.05.2001
GR23.05.2001
LI23.05.2001
DK23.08.2001
PT23.08.2001
SE23.08.2001
IE14.09.2001
MC14.09.2001
ES30.11.2001
Former [2004/04]AT23.05.2001
BE23.05.2001
CH23.05.2001
LI23.05.2001
DK23.08.2001
PT23.08.2001
SE23.08.2001
IE14.09.2001
MC14.09.2001
ES30.11.2001
Former [2003/45]AT23.05.2001
BE23.05.2001
CH23.05.2001
LI23.05.2001
DK23.08.2001
PT23.08.2001
SE23.08.2001
IE14.09.2001
MC14.09.2001
Former [2002/48]AT23.05.2001
BE23.05.2001
CH23.05.2001
LI23.05.2001
PT23.08.2001
SE23.08.2001
IE14.09.2001
MC14.09.2001
Former [2002/43]AT23.05.2001
BE23.05.2001
CH23.05.2001
LI23.05.2001
PT23.08.2001
SE23.08.2001
MC14.09.2001
Former [2002/25]AT23.05.2001
BE23.05.2001
CH23.05.2001
LI23.05.2001
PT23.08.2001
SE23.08.2001
Former [2002/15]AT23.05.2001
BE23.05.2001
CH23.05.2001
LI23.05.2001
SE23.08.2001
Former [2002/14]AT23.05.2001
BE23.05.2001
SE23.08.2001
Former [2002/12]BE23.05.2001
SE23.08.2001
Former [2002/05]SE23.08.2001
Documents cited:Search[XP]EP0473253  ;
 [A]FR2593827  ;
 [A]EP0375406
 [XP]  - PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE OF USA, vol. 88, no. 18, 15 September 1991, WASHINGTON (US) pages 8106 - 8110, G. HADLACZKY ET AL: "Centromere formation in mouse cells cotransformed with human DNA and a dominant marker gene"
 [XP]  - PROCEEDING OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, vol. 88, no. 24, December 1991, WASHINGTON (US) pages 11042 - 11046, T. PRAZNOVSZKY ET AL: "De novo chromosome formation in rodent cells"
 [Y]  - BIOTECHNOLOGY ABSTRACTS, DERWENT PUBLICATIONS LTD., LONDON (GB) ABSTRACT NO. 89-09395, D.J. BOWER: "Constructing a fully defined human minichromosome: cloning a centromere - human centromere isolation from mouse cell culture transfected with human chromatin and a selectable marker; application in gene therapy"; & Eur. Congr. Biotechnol. 1987 vol. 3 page 571
 [Y]  - SOMATIC CELL AND MOLECULAR GENETICS, vol. 15, no. 5, September 1989, (US) pages 445 - 460, K. CARINE ET AL: "Molecular characterization of human minichromosomes with centromere from chromosome 1 in human-hamster hybrid cells"
Examination   - K.F. COOPER AND C. TYLER-SMITH, "The putative centromere-forming sequence lambdaCM8 is a single copy sequence and is not a component of most human centromeres", HUMAN MOLECULAR GENETICS, (1992), vol. 1, no. 9, pages 753 - 754
    - N.I. MCGILL ET AL.,, "LambdaCM8, a human sequence with putative centromeric function, does not map to the centromere but is present in one to two copies at 9qter", HUMAN MOLECULAR GENETICS, (1992), vol. 1, no. 9, pages 749 - 751
by applicant   - HADLACZKY, INTERNATL. REV., (1985), vol. 94, pages 57 - 76
    - BLACKBURN ET AL., ANN. REV. BIOCHEM., (1984), vol. 93, pages 163 - 194
    - CLARKE ET AL., ANN. REV. GENET., (1985), vol. 19, pages 29 - 56
    - MURRAY. ET AL., NATURE, (1983), vol. 305, pages 189 - 193
    - BURKE ET AL., SCIENCE, (1987), vol. 236, pages 806 - 812
    - DAVIDSON, SOM, CELL GENET., (1976), vol. 2, pages 165 - 176
    - SZYBALSKI, N.C.I. MONOGR., (1982), vol. 7, pages 75 - 89
    - GRAHAM ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1973), vol. 52, pages 456 - 467
    - MEYNE. ET AL., CHROMOSOMA, (1990), vol. 99, pages 3 - 10
    - HILWIG ET AL., EXP. CELL RES, (1973), vol. 81, pages 474 - 477
    - WONG ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS. RES, (1988), vol. 16, pages 11645 - 11661