Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0537572

EP0537572 - A locking device for an apparatus for applying surgical fasteners [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.04.2000
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.04.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.06.2000 [2000/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
United States Surgical Corporation
150 Glover Avenue Norwalk
Connecticut 06856 / US
[N/P]
Former [1993/16]For all designated states
United States Surgical Corporation
150 Glover Avenue
Norwalk, Connecticut 06856 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Green, David T.
28 Bermuda Road
Westport, CT 06880 / US
02 / Bolanos, Henry
9 Tonetta Circle
East Norwalk, 06855 / US
03 / Viola, Frank J.
366 Greatquarter Road
Sandy Hook, CT 06482 / US
[1993/16]
Representative(s)Marsh, Roy David , et al
Hoffmann Eitle
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE
[N/P]
Former [1993/16]Marsh, Roy David , et al
Hoffmann Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20
D-81904 München / DE
Application number, filing date92116884.502.10.1992
[1993/16]
Priority number, dateUS1991078086118.10.1991         Original published format: US 780861
[1993/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0537572
Date:21.04.1993
Language:EN
[1993/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0537572
Date:20.07.1994
Language:EN
[1994/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0537572
Date:23.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.05.1994
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/072
[1993/50]
Former International [1993/16]A61B17/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1993/16]
TitleGerman:Sperrvorrichtung für chirurgisches Klammergerät[1993/16]
English:A locking device for an apparatus for applying surgical fasteners[1993/16]
French:Dispositif de verrouillage pour une agrafeuse chirurgicale[1993/16]
Examination procedure18.11.1994Examination requested  [1995/03]
29.04.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.08.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.10.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.02.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.08.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.12.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.03.1999Fee for grant paid
17.03.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.03.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
30.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
29.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
21.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]US4607636  (KULA JOHN [US], et al);
 [A]EP0373762  (ETHICON INC [US]);
 [A]EP0399700  (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP [US]);
 [E]EP0514139  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US])
by applicantUS4354628
 US4665916
 US4568009
 EP0373762
 EP0399700
 EP0489436