Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0537598

EP0537598 - Compressive margical implant [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.11.1996
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 09.01.2008  [2008/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PINA VERTRIEBS AG
Engestrasse 35
8212 Neuhausen 2/SH / CH
[N/P]
Former [1993/16]For all designated states
PINA VERTRIEBS AG
Engestrasse 35
CH-8212 Neuhausen 2/SH / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Müller, Walter
Hopfenstrasse 38
W-7243 Voehringen / DE
02 / Piotrowski, Georg
Lerchenweg 2
W-7238 Oberndorf / DE
[1993/16]
Representative(s)Neymeyer, Franz
Haselweg 20
78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/08]Neymeyer, Franz, Dipl.-Ing. (FH)
Haselweg 20
D-78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
Former [1993/16]Neymeyer, Franz, Dipl.-Ing. (FH)
Haselweg 20
D-78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
Application number, filing date92117050.206.10.1992
[1993/16]
Priority number, dateCH1991000305518.10.1991         Original published format: CH 305591
[1993/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0537598
Date:21.04.1993
Language:DE
[1993/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0537598
Date:22.12.1993
Language:DE
[1993/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0537598
Date:24.01.1996
[1996/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.11.1993
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/56, A61B17/60
[1993/48]
Former International [1993/16]A61B17/56
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1993/16]
TitleGerman:Medizintechnisches Kompressionsimplantat[1993/16]
English:Compressive margical implant[1993/16]
French:Implant chirurgical de compression[1993/16]
Examination procedure21.01.1994Examination requested  [1994/12]
13.07.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.07.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.10.1995Fee for grant paid
21.10.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.10.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1997/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.09.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
11.09.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE24.01.1996
DK24.01.1996
ES24.01.1996
FR24.01.1996
IT24.01.1996
NL24.01.1996
PT24.04.1996
SE24.04.1996
AT06.10.1996
[2006/14]
Former [2003/07]BE24.01.1996
DK24.01.1996
ES24.01.1996
IT24.01.1996
NL24.01.1996
PT24.04.1996
SE24.04.1996
FR21.06.1996
AT06.10.1996
Former [2002/25]BE24.01.1996
DK24.01.1996
ES24.01.1996
IT24.01.1996
PT24.04.1996
SE24.04.1996
FR21.06.1996
AT06.10.1996
Former [1999/42]BE24.01.1996
DK24.01.1996
IT24.01.1996
PT24.04.1996
SE24.04.1996
FR21.06.1996
AT06.10.1996
Former [1998/15]BE24.01.1996
DK24.01.1996
PT24.04.1996
SE24.04.1996
FR21.06.1996
AT06.10.1996
Former [1998/14]BE24.01.1996
PT24.04.1996
SE24.04.1996
FR21.06.1996
Former [1997/04]BE24.01.1996
SE24.04.1996
FR21.06.1996
Former [1996/51]BE24.01.1996
SE24.04.1996
Former [1996/38]SE24.04.1996
Documents cited:Search[A]US4771767  ;
 [A]EP0383992  ;
 [A]WO8001137  ;
 [A]DE561561  ;
 [A]WO8504096  ;
 [A]DE9004240U  ;
 [A]DE3132520