blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0539819


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
16.04.1999 No opposition filed within time limit published on  02.06.1999 [1999/22]
24.04.1998 (Expected) grant published on  10.06.1998 [1998/24]
23.01.1998 Communication of intention to grant a patent
10.12.1997 Communication of intention to grant
10.12.1997 Communication of intention to grant a patent
28.11.1997 Communication of intention to grant
07.11.1997 Renewal fee
04.09.1997 Communication of intention to grant
05.02.1997 Examination report or reply
08.01.1997 Examination report or reply
14.11.1996 Examination report or reply
06.11.1996 Renewal fee
12.06.1996 Examination report or reply
05.06.1996 Examination report or reply
31.01.1996 Examination report or reply
25.01.1996 Examination report or reply
12.09.1995 First examination report
31.03.1994 Request for examination filed published on  18.05.1994 [1994/20]
30.08.1993 Publication of search report published on  20.10.1993 [1993/42]
17.08.1993 Change - classification published on  06.10.1993 [1993/40]
19.03.1993 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.05.1993 [1993/18]