blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0539819
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59209369D 16.07.1998D1
Priority number Date
DE59209369 17.10.1992
DE4135588 29.10.1991
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JPH05214091Global Dossier 24.08.1993A
Priority number Date
DE4135588 29.10.1991
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0539819Global Dossier 10.06.1998B1
EP0539819 20.10.1993A3
EP0539819 05.05.1993A2
Priority number Date
DE4135588 29.10.1991
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT167206T 15.06.1998T
Priority number Date
DE4135588 29.10.1991
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA2080516 25.01.2000C
CA2080516 30.04.1993A1
Priority number Date
DE4135588 29.10.1991
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE4135588 06.05.1993A1
Priority number Date
DE4135588 29.10.1991
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DK0539819T 12.10.1998T3
Priority number Date
DE4135588 29.10.1991
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2117023T 01.08.1998T3
Priority number Date
DE4135588 29.10.1991
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR100239109B 15.01.2000B1
KR930008004 20.05.1993A
Priority number Date
DE4135588 29.10.1991
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US5476969 19.12.1995A
Priority number Date
DE4135588 29.10.1991