Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0539819

EP0539819 - Highly-reactive polyoxyalkylenepolyols with bound tertiary amino groups, method for their production and their use in the production of polyisocyanate-polyaddition products [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.04.1999
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.04.1999No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.06.1999 [1999/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
[1998/24]
Former [1993/18]For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Hinz, Werner, Dr.
Hanns-Fay-Strasse 1
W-6710 Frankenthal / DE
02 / Adams, Stefan, Dr.
Defreggerstrasse 5
W-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE
03 / Koehler, Ulrich, Dr.
Osterburker Strasse 19
W-6800 Mannheim 51 / DE
04 / Maletzko, Christian, Dr.
Sandhofer Strasse 275
W-6800 Mannheim 31 / DE
05 / Vorspohl, Klaus, Dr.
Bannwasserstrasse 9
W-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE
06 / Zschiesche, Ruth, Dr.
Steubenstrasse 88
W-6800 Mannheim 24 / DE
[1993/18]
Application number, filing date92117788.717.10.1992
[1993/18]
Priority number, dateDE1991413558829.10.1991         Original published format: DE 4135588
[1993/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0539819
Date:05.05.1993
Language:DE
[1993/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0539819
Date:20.10.1993
Language:DE
[1993/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0539819
Date:10.06.1998
Language:DE
[1998/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.08.1993
ClassificationInternational:C08G65/26, C08G18/50, // (C08G18/50, 101:00)
[1993/40]
Former International [1993/18]C08G65/02, C08G18/50, // (C08G18/50, 101:00)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1993/18]
TitleGerman:Hochreaktive, tertiäre Aminogruppen gebunden enthaltende Polyoxyalkylenpolyole, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung zur Herstellung von Polyisocyanat-Polyadditionsprodukten[1993/18]
English:Highly-reactive polyoxyalkylenepolyols with bound tertiary amino groups, method for their production and their use in the production of polyisocyanate-polyaddition products[1993/18]
French:Polyoxyalkylènepolyols hautement réactifs contenant des groupes amine tertiaire liés, procédé pour leur production et leur utilisation pour la production de produits de polyaddition de polyisocyanates[1993/18]
Examination procedure22.03.1994Examination requested  [1994/20]
15.09.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.01.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.02.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.05.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.06.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.10.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.01.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.02.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.09.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
28.10.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
15.12.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.01.1998Fee for grant paid
09.01.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.03.1999No opposition filed within time limit [1999/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
24.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
28.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
29.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0047371  ;
 [X]US3105063  ;
 [X]US4555531  ;
 [X]US4368137