Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0543176

EP0543176 - Intrusion alarm system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 22.10.2008  [2008/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fritz Fuss GmbH & Co.
Johannes-Mauthe-Strasse 14
D-72458 Albstadt / DE
[1993/21]
Inventor(s)01 / Künzel, Reiner
Pestalozziweg 10
W-7460 Balingen-Frommern / DE
[1993/21]
Representative(s)Lang, Friedrich , et al
Lang & Tomerius
Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Rosa-Bavarese-Strasse 5
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/43]Lang, Friedrich , et al
Lang & Tomerius Patentanwälte Landsberger Strasse 300
80687 München / DE
Former [2000/33]Lang, Friedrich , et al
Patentanwälte Weber & Heim Bavariaring 29
80336 München / DE
Former [1993/21]Heim, Hans-Karl, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Weber & Heim Patentanwälte Irmgardstrasse 3
D-81479 München / DE
Application number, filing date92118194.723.10.1992
[1993/21]
Priority number, dateDE1991413810119.11.1991         Original published format: DE 4138101
[1993/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0543176
Date:26.05.1993
Language:DE
[1993/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0543176
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.02.1993
ClassificationInternational:G08B13/22
[1993/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   LI,   NL [1993/21]
TitleGerman:Einbruchmeldeanlage[1993/21]
English:Intrusion alarm system[1993/21]
French:Installation de signalisation d'intrusion[1993/21]
Examination procedure26.11.1993Examination requested  [1994/04]
21.02.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.10.1997Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
16.12.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.02.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.09.1999Fee for grant paid
10.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Request for further processing for:10.10.1997Request for further processing filed
10.10.1997Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
21.01.1998Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
30.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
31.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
29.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
29.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL12.01.2000
[2003/07]
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4940964  ;
 [Y]EP0170559  ;
 [A]EP0210889  ;
 [A]FR2478855