Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Legal status: EP0544146

Designated contracting statesCH 
DE 
FR 
IT 
LI 
SE 
Examination procedure02.10.1996Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [1997/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
12.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.199605   M06   Not yet paid
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:02.06.1993 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):CH DE FR IT LI SE
 
Event date:08.12.1993 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19931014
 
Event date:06.07.1994 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:19940520
 
Event date:26.02.1997 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:19960903
 
Event date:21.05.1996 
Event description:DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA
 
Event date:08.03.1996 
Event description:DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS AGRA
 
Event date:15.04.1993 
Event description:PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012
 
Event date:10.01.1997 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: THE APPLICATION IS DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN