blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0544146

EP0544146 - Clamping device for workpieces [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.01.1997
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip10.01.1997Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.02.1997 [1997/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Christmann, Helmut
Carl-Benz-Strasse 9
D-75217 Birkenfeld / DE
[1993/22]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1993/22]
Representative(s)Twelmeier, Ulrich, et al
Zerrennerstrasse 23-25
75172 Pforzheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [1993/22]Twelmeier, Ulrich, Dipl.Phys., et al
Westliche Karl-Friedrich-Strasse 29-31
D-75172 Pforzheim / DE
Application number, filing date92119251.411.11.1992
[1993/22]
Priority number, dateDE19910014638U23.11.1991         Original published format: DE 9114638 U
[1993/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0544146
Date:02.06.1993
Language:DE
[1993/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.02.1993
ClassificationIPC:B23Q1/16, B25B11/00
[1993/22]
CPC:
B25B11/00 (EP); B25B5/006 (EP); B25B5/166 (EP)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   IT,   LI,   SE [1993/22]
TitleGerman:Einspanneinrichtung für Werkstücke[1993/22]
English:Clamping device for workpieces[1993/22]
French:Moyens de serrage pour pièces à travailler[1993/22]
File destroyed:13.09.2003
Examination procedure14.10.1993Examination requested  [1993/49]
20.05.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.11.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.01.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.05.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.08.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.11.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.05.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.09.1996Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1997/09]
02.10.1996Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [1997/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
12.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.199605   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US3596863  ;
 [A]US3436050  ;
 [A]US4875666  ;
 [A]DE1102312  ;
 [A]DE132876  ;
 [A]EP0271393
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.