Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Event history: EP0544198


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
09.01.1998 No opposition filed within time limit published on  25.02.1998 [1998/09]
17.01.1997 (Expected) grant published on  05.03.1997 [1997/10]
22.11.1996 Communication of intention to grant a patent
29.10.1996 Renewal fee
03.08.1996 Communication of intention to grant a patent
02.04.1996 Communication of intention to grant
12.02.1996 Examination report or reply
11.10.1995 First examination report
15.04.1993 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  02.06.1993 [1993/22]
15.04.1993 Request for examination filed published on  02.06.1993 [1993/22]