blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0546378

EP0546378 - Illumination circuit for a LCD display in a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.01.1998
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip23.01.1998No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.03.1998 [1998/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Blaupunkt-Werke GmbH
Postfach 77 77 77
31132 Hildesheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [1993/24]For all designated states
Blaupunkt-Werke GmbH
Postfach 77 77 77
D-31132 Hildesheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Altmann, Albrecht
Königsberger Strasse 2
W-3226 Sibbesse / DE
[1993/24]
Representative(s)(deleted)
[1994/51]
Former [1994/08]Eilers, Norbert, Dipl.-Phys.
Blaupunkt-Werke GmbH Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 77 77 77
D-31132 Hildesheim / DE
Former [1993/24]Eilers, Norbert, Dipl.-Phys.
Blaupunkt-Werke GmbH Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 77 77 77
D-31132 Hildesheim / DE
Application number, filing date92120055.625.11.1992
[1993/24]
Priority number, dateDE1991414105913.12.1991         Original published format: DE 4141059
[1993/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0546378
Date:16.06.1993
Language:DE
[1993/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0546378
Date:20.12.1995
Language:DE
[1995/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0546378
Date:19.03.1997
Language:DE
[1997/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.10.1995
ClassificationIPC:G09G3/34, H05B39/04
[1995/51]
CPC:
H05B39/047 (EP); Y02B20/00 (EP)
Former IPC [1993/24]G09G3/34
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   GB,   LI,   PT [1993/24]
TitleGerman:Schaltungsanordnung für die Beleuchtung einer LCD-Anzeigevorrichtung in einem Kraftfahrzeug[1993/24]
English:Illumination circuit for a LCD display in a motor vehicle[1993/24]
French:Circuit d'illumination d'un affichage à cristaux liquides dans un véhicule à moteur[1993/24]
Examination procedure20.06.1996Examination requested  [1996/33]
27.08.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.09.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.12.1996Fee for grant paid
19.12.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.12.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1998/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
02.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3031093  (MERIT WERK MERTEN & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 8, line 8 - page 11, line 21; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0163969  (TRW MESSMER [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE3611724  (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [DE]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 3 - column 4, line 60; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE3920847  (ALBRECHT PAUL [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.