Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0548580

EP0548580 - Non-occludable transducer for in-the-ear applications [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.01.1997
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 09.01.2008  [2008/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TIBBETTS INDUSTRIES, INC.
Colcord Avenue Camden
Maine 04843 / US
[N/P]
Former [1993/26]For all designated states
TIBBETTS INDUSTRIES, INC.
Colcord Avenue
Camden, Maine 04843 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Tibbetts, George C.
11 Sea Street
Camden, Maine 04843 / US
02 / Madaffari, Peter L.
Box 4508F
Camden, Maine 04843 / US
[1993/26]
Representative(s)Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patent PartG mbB
European Patent Attorneys
Patenta
Radeckestrasse 43
81245 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1995/16]Blumbach, Kramer & Partner
Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43
D-81245 München / DE
Former [1993/35]Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte
Radeckestrasse 43
D-81245 München / DE
Former [1993/26]Hoffmann, Eckart, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwalt, Bahnhofstrasse 103
D-82166 Gräfelfing / DE
Application number, filing date92120178.626.11.1992
[1993/26]
Priority number, dateUS1991081257220.12.1991         Original published format: US 812572
[1993/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0548580
Date:30.06.1993
Language:EN
[1993/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0548580
Date:20.03.1996
Language:EN
[1996/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.05.1993
ClassificationInternational:H04R25/02, H04R25/00
[1993/26]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT [1993/26]
TitleGerman:Nicht-verschliessbarer Wandler für IdO-Verwendungen[1993/26]
English:Non-occludable transducer for in-the-ear applications[1993/26]
French:Transducteur sans fermeture pour applications dans les prothèses auditives intra-auriculaires[1993/26]
Examination procedure13.08.1993Examination requested  [1993/41]
28.05.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.08.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.02.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.05.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
11.09.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
15.09.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.12.1995Fee for grant paid
18.12.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.12.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1997/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
29.11.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE20.03.1996
ES20.03.1996
FR20.03.1996
GR20.03.1996
IT20.03.1996
PT20.06.1996
IE26.11.1996
LU30.11.1996
[2006/14]
Former [2002/25]BE20.03.1996
ES20.03.1996
GR20.03.1996
IT20.03.1996
PT20.06.1996
FR14.08.1996
IE26.11.1996
LU30.11.1996
Former [2001/05]BE20.03.1996
GR20.03.1996
IT20.03.1996
PT20.06.1996
FR14.08.1996
IE26.11.1996
LU30.11.1996
Former [2000/05]BE20.03.1996
GR20.03.1996
IT20.03.1996
PT20.06.1996
FR14.08.1996
LU30.11.1996
Former [1999/42]BE20.03.1996
IT20.03.1996
PT20.06.1996
FR14.08.1996
Former [1998/14]BE20.03.1996
PT20.06.1996
FR14.08.1996
Former [1997/12]BE20.03.1996
FR14.08.1996
Former [1996/52]BE20.03.1996
Documents cited:Search[A]US3671684  ;
 [A]US4000381  ;
 [A]US3491215  ;
 [A]EP0421233  ;
 [A]EP0451784  ;
 [A]FR2596644  ;
 [A]DE3614739