Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0546445

EP0546445 - Method for controlling a digital, cellular mobile communication network and mobile communication network using that method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  01.10.2004
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2009Change: Legal effect of interlocutory decision 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DETECON DEUTSCHE TELEPOST CONSULTING GmbH
Langer Grabenweg 35
53175 Bonn / DE
[1998/26]
Former [1993/24]For all designated states
DETECON DEUTSCHE TELEPOST CONSULTING GmbH
Langer Grabenweg 35
D-53175 Bonn / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Schmidt, Werner Artur Karl Eugen, Dr.-Ing.
Ardkeenagh, Boyle
Co. Roscommon / IE
02 / Stahl, Hans-Joachim, Dr.-Ing.
Friedrichsallee 31
W-5300 Bonn 2 / DE
[2000/36]
Former [1993/24]01 / Smidt, Werner Artur Karl Eugen, Dr.-Ing.
Ardkeenagh, Boyle
Co. Roscommon / IE
02 / Stahl, Hans-Joachim, Dr.-Ing.
Friedrichsallee 31
W-5300 Bonn 2 / DE
Representative(s)Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60
88113 Lindau / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/45]Riebling, Peter, Dr.-Ing., Patentanwalt
Postfach 31 60
D-88113 Lindau / DE
Application number, filing date92120615.703.12.1992
[1993/24]
Priority number, dateDE1991414074211.12.1991         Original published format: DE 4140742
[1993/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0546445
Date:16.06.1993
Language:DE
[1993/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0546445
Date:23.03.1994
Language:DE
[1994/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0546445
Date:24.06.1998
Language:DE
[1998/26]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0546445
Date:17.11.2004
Language:DE
[2004/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.02.1994
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/26, H04L1/06
[1994/12]
Former International [1993/24]H04B7/26
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1993/24]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Betrieb eines digitalen, zellularen Mobilkommunikationsnetzes und ein nach dem Verfahren arbeitendes Mobilkommunikationsnetz[1993/24]
English:Method for controlling a digital, cellular mobile communication network and mobile communication network using that method[1993/24]
French:Méthode de commande d'un réseau de communication mobile numérique cellulaire et réseau de communication mobile utilisant cette méthode[1993/24]
Examination procedure04.05.1994Examination requested  [1994/27]
25.10.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.02.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.06.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.09.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.11.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.01.1998Fee for grant paid
10.01.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.03.1999   
Robert Bosch GmbH
Zentralabteilung Patente Postfach 30 02 20
D-70442 Stuttgart / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1999/19]
Opponent(s)01  19.03.1999   
Robert Bosch GmbH
Zentralabteilung Patente Postfach 30 02 20
D-70442 Stuttgart / DE
05.07.1999Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
30.10.1999Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.05.2000Date of oral proceedings
18.07.2000Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
18.07.2000Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
05.05.2004Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
16.06.2004Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
27.08.2004Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition16.09.2000Appeal received No.  T0994/00
23.11.2000Statement of grounds filed
28.05.2004Interlocutory revision of appeal
28.05.2004Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
05.05.2004Date of oral proceedings
12.05.2004Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
24.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
25.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
01.02.1993AT   M01   Fee paid on   11.02.1993
01.02.1993BE   M01   Fee paid on   11.02.1993
01.02.1993CH   M01   Fee paid on   11.02.1993
01.02.1993DE   M01   Fee paid on   11.02.1993
01.02.1993DK   M01   Fee paid on   11.02.1993
01.02.1993ES   M01   Fee paid on   11.02.1993
01.02.1993FR   M01   Fee paid on   11.02.1993
01.02.1993GB   M01   Fee paid on   11.02.1993
01.02.1993GR   M01   Fee paid on   11.02.1993
01.02.1993IT   M01   Fee paid on   11.02.1993
01.02.1993LU   M01   Fee paid on   11.02.1993
01.02.1993MC   M01   Fee paid on   15.02.1993
01.02.1993PT   M01   Fee paid on   15.02.1993
01.02.1993SE   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES24.06.1998
GR24.06.1998
PT24.09.1998
LU03.12.1998
BE31.12.1998
MC30.06.1999
DK03.12.2001
SE04.12.2001
CH31.12.2001
LI31.12.2001
NL01.07.2002
[2004/38]
Former [2003/45]ES24.06.1998
GR24.06.1998
PT24.09.1998
BE31.12.1998
LU31.12.1998
MC30.06.1999
DK03.12.2001
SE04.12.2001
CH31.12.2001
LI31.12.2001
NL01.07.2002
Former [2003/18]ES24.06.1998
GR24.06.1998
PT24.09.1998
BE31.12.1998
LU31.12.1998
MC30.06.1999
SE04.12.2001
CH31.12.2001
LI31.12.2001
NL01.07.2002
Former [2003/17]ES24.06.1998
GR24.06.1998
PT24.09.1998
BE31.12.1998
LU31.12.1998
MC01.07.1999
SE04.12.2001
CH31.12.2001
LI31.12.2001
NL01.07.2002
Former [2003/16]ES24.06.1998
GR24.06.1998
PT24.09.1998
BE31.12.1998
LU31.12.1998
MC30.06.1999
SE04.12.2001
CH31.12.2001
LI31.12.2001
NL01.07.2002
Former [2002/48]ES24.06.1998
GR24.06.1998
PT24.09.1998
BE31.12.1998
LU31.12.1998
MC30.06.1999
SE04.12.2001
NL01.07.2002
Former [2002/37]ES24.06.1998
GR24.06.1998
PT24.09.1998
BE31.12.1998
LU31.12.1998
MC30.06.1999
SE04.12.2001
Former [2002/25]ES24.06.1998
GR24.06.1998
PT24.09.1998
BE31.12.1998
LU31.12.1998
MC30.06.1999
Former [2001/23]GR24.06.1998
PT24.09.1998
BE31.12.1998
LU31.12.1998
MC30.06.1999
Former [2000/23]PT24.09.1998
BE31.12.1998
LU31.12.1998
MC30.06.1999
Former [2000/07]PT24.09.1998
LU31.12.1998
Former [1999/32]PT24.09.1998
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH03179820  ;
 [A]DE3338510  (ANT) [A] 1-10 * claim - *;
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911030), vol. 015, no. 438, Database accession no. (E - 1128), & JP03179820 A 19910805 (NTT) [X] 1,3 * abstract *
 [A]  - SEIICHI SAMPEI, "Development of Japanese Adaptive Equalizing Technology toward High Bit Rate Data Transmission in Land Mobile Communications", THE TRANSACTIONS OF THE INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS, INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATION ENGINEERS, TOKYO,JP;, (199106), vol. E74, no. 6, pages 1512 - 1521, XP000262308 [A] 1-10 * page 1512, column L, line 1 - column R, line 26 *
ExaminationDE3744075