Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0546445 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0546445



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 358
01.12.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 10
25.11.2004 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
08.10.2004 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
08.10.2004 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
27.08.2004 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
27.08.2004 Translation of the claims Opposition 3
27.08.2004 Translation of the claims Opposition 3
01.07.2004 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
01.07.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.06.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
16.06.2004 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
16.06.2004 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
16.06.2004 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
16.06.2004 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
03.06.2004 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
28.05.2004 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 13
12.05.2004 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 2
12.05.2004 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 2
05.05.2004 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
30.04.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.04.2004 Claims Appeal 3
28.04.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
27.04.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
26.04.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.04.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
08.04.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.04.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
31.03.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
20.03.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.03.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.03.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.03.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
17.03.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.03.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.03.2004 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
11.03.2004 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
05.03.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
07.01.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.01.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
31.12.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
30.12.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.12.2003 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
23.12.2003 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
23.12.2003 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 6
17.10.2003 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
17.10.2003 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
12.12.2001 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
02.04.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.03.2001 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
27.03.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
27.03.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
30.11.2000 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
23.11.2000 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 18
23.11.2000 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
13.11.2000 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
13.11.2000 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
16.09.2000 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
22.07.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.07.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.07.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.07.2000 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
18.07.2000 Annex to the communication Opposition 6
18.07.2000 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
18.07.2000 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 7
18.07.2000 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
18.07.2000 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 2
18.07.2000 Text intended for grant Opposition 6
08.05.2000 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
20.01.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.01.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.01.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.01.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.01.2000 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
14.01.2000 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
14.01.2000 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
23.12.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
22.12.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
14.12.1999 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
14.12.1999 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
13.12.1999 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
15.11.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.10.1999 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 6
05.07.1999 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
05.07.1999 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
30.03.1999 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
22.03.1999 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
22.03.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
19.03.1999 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
14.05.1998 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
29.01.1998 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
29.01.1998 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
29.01.1998 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
26.11.1997 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
19.11.1997 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
24.09.1997 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
24.09.1997 Text intended for grant Search / examination 12
15.09.1997 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
20.06.1997 Claims Search / examination 3
20.06.1997 Description Search / examination 4
20.06.1997 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.04.1997 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
19.02.1997 Claims Search / examination 3
19.02.1997 Description Search / examination 5
19.02.1997 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
25.10.1996 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
15.10.1996 General enquiry Search / examination 1
27.02.1996 Annex Search / examination 1
27.02.1996 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
14.12.1995 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
23.09.1994 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
15.09.1994 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
02.02.1994 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
02.02.1994 European search report Search / examination 2
28.07.1993 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
06.02.1993 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
06.02.1993 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7
01.02.1993 Deficiencies in application documents Search / examination 2
01.02.1993 Late payment of filing fee/search fee without additional fee Search / examination 2
03.12.1992 Abstract Search / examination 1
03.12.1992 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
03.12.1992 Claims Search / examination 3
03.12.1992 Description Search / examination 8
03.12.1992 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.12.1992 Priority document Search / examination 11
03.12.1992 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5