Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0550031

EP0550031 - Aerosol compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  02.08.2002
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SOLVAY (Société Anonyme)
Rue du Prince Albert, 33
1050 Bruxelles / BE
[N/P]
Former [1996/50]For all designated states
SOLVAY (Société Anonyme)
Rue du Prince Albert, 33
B-1050 Bruxelles / BE
Former [1993/27]For all designated states
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Deger, Hans-Matthias, Dr.
Herrnpfad 10
W-6238 Hofheim/Ts. / DE
02 / Schütz, Claudia
Dresdner Strasse 9
W-6093 Flörsheim am Main / DE
[1993/27]
Representative(s)Jacques, Philippe , et al
Solvay S.A.
Département de la Propriété Industrielle
Rue de Ransbeek, 310
1120 Bruxelles / BE
[N/P]
Former [1997/02]Jacques, Philippe , et al
Solvay S.A. Département Propriété Industrielle 310, rue de Ransbeek
1120 Bruxelles / BE
Application number, filing date92121985.324.12.1992
[1993/27]
Priority number, dateDE1991414326331.12.1991         Original published format: DE 4143263
[1993/27]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0550031
Date:07.07.1993
Language:DE
[1993/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0550031
Date:08.05.1996
Language:DE
[1996/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.04.1993
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/00, A61K9/12
[1993/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1993/27]
TitleGerman:Medizinische Aerosolformulierung[1993/27]
English:Aerosol compositions[1993/27]
French:Compositions d'aérosol[1993/27]
Examination procedure16.12.1993Examination requested  [1994/06]
25.01.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.08.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.11.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.02.1996Fee for grant paid
19.02.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  06.02.1997  18.02.1997  ADMISSIBLE
Sofotec GmbH & Co KG
Weismüllerstr. 45
60314 Frankfurt/Main / DE
Opponent's representative
Fleischer, Holm Herbert
polypatent
Postfach 40 02 43
51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
 02  06.02.1997  18.02.1997  ADMISSIBLE
LES LABORATOIRES SERVIER
22 rue Garnier
92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR
Opponent's representative
ter Meer, Nicolaus
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
 03  06.02.1997  18.02.1997  ADMISSIBLE
SkyePharma AG
Eptingerstrasse 51
CH - 4132 Muttenz / CH
Opponent's representative
Zimmermann, Hans
c/o A. Braun Braun Héritier Eschmann AG Patentanwälte VSP Holbeinstrasse 36-38 Postfach 160
4003 Basel / CH
 04  07.02.1997  18.02.1997  ADMISSIBLE
AstraZeneca AB
c/o Global Intellectual Property, Patents
151 85 Södertälje / SE
 05  07.02.1997  18.02.1997  ADMISSIBLE
Rhône-Poulenc Rorer Ltd
RPR House 50 Kings Hill Avenue Kings Hill
West Malling, Kent ME19 4TA / GB
Opponent's representative
Jones, Stephen Anthony
AdamsonJones BioCity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham
NG1 1GF / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2002/17]
Opponent(s)01  06.02.1997  18.02.1997  ADMISSIBLE
Sofotec GmbH & Co KG
Weismüllerstr. 45
60314 Frankfurt/Main / DE
Opponent's representative
Fleischer, Holm Herbert, Dr.
Sternagel, Fleischer, Godemeyer & Partner Patentanwälte Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
 02  06.02.1997  18.02.1997  ADMISSIBLE
LES LABORATOIRES SERVIER
22 rue Garnier
92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR
Opponent's representative
ter Meer, Nicolaus, Dipl.-Chem., Dr.
TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
 03  06.02.1997  18.02.1997  ADMISSIBLE
SkyePharma AG
Eptingerstrasse 51
CH - 4132 Muttenz / CH
Opponent's representative
Zimmermann, Hans, Dr.
c/o A. Braun Braun Héritier Eschmann AG Patentanwälte VSP Holbeinstrasse 36-38 Postfach 160
4003 Basel / CH
 04  07.02.1997  18.02.1997  ADMISSIBLE
AstraZeneca AB
c/o Global Intellectual Property, Patents
151 85 Södertälje / SE
 05  07.02.1997  18.02.1997  ADMISSIBLE
Rhône-Poulenc Rorer Ltd
RPR House, 50 Kings Hill Avenue Kings Hill
West Malling, Kent ME19 4TA / GB
Opponent's representative
Jones, Stephen Anthony
AdamsonJones Broadway Business Centre 32a Stoney Street
Nottingham NG1 1LL / GB
Former [2002/01]
Opponent(s)01  06.02.1997  18.02.1997  ADMISSIBLE
ASTA Medica AG
An der Pikardie 10
01277 Dresden / DE
Opponent's representative
Fleischer, Holm Herbert, Dr.
Sternagel, Fleischer, Godemeyer & Partner Patentanwälte Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
 02  06.02.1997  18.02.1997  ADMISSIBLE
LES LABORATOIRES SERVIER
22 rue Garnier
92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR
Opponent's representative
ter Meer, Nicolaus, Dipl.-Chem., Dr.
TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
 03  06.02.1997  18.02.1997  ADMISSIBLE
SkyePharma AG
Eptingerstrasse 51
CH - 4132 Muttenz / CH
Opponent's representative
Zimmermann, Hans, Dr.
c/o A. Braun Braun Héritier Eschmann AG Patentanwälte VSP Holbeinstrasse 36-38 Postfach 160
4003 Basel / CH
 04  07.02.1997  18.02.1997  ADMISSIBLE
AstraZeneca AB
c/o Global Intellectual Property, Patents
151 85 Södertälje / SE
 05  07.02.1997  18.02.1997  ADMISSIBLE
Rhône-Poulenc Rorer Ltd
RPR House, 50 Kings Hill Avenue Kings Hill
West Malling, Kent ME19 4TA / GB
Opponent's representative
Jones, Stephen Anthony
AdamsonJones Broadway Business Centre 32a Stoney Street
Nottingham NG1 1LL / GB
Former [2001/50]
Opponent(s)01  06.02.1997  18.02.1997  ADMISSIBLE
ASTA Medica AG
An der Pikardie 10
01277 Dresden / DE
Opponent's representative
Fleischer, Holm Herbert, Dr.
Sternagel, Fleischer, Godemeyer & Partner Patentanwälte Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
 02  06.02.1997  18.02.1997  ADMISSIBLE
ADIR ET COMPAGNIE
1, rue Carke Hébert
F-92145 Courbevoie Cédex / FR
Opponent's representative
ter Meer, Nicolaus, Dipl.-Chem., Dr.
TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
 03  06.02.1997  18.02.1997  ADMISSIBLE
SkyePharma AG
Eptingerstrasse 51
CH - 4132 Muttenz / CH
Opponent's representative
Zimmermann, Hans, Dr.
c/o A. Braun Braun Héritier Eschmann AG Patentanwälte VSP Holbeinstrasse 36-38 Postfach 160
4003 Basel / CH
 04  07.02.1997  18.02.1997  ADMISSIBLE
AstraZeneca AB
c/o Global Intellectual Property, Patents
151 85 Södertälje / SE
 05  07.02.1997  18.02.1997  ADMISSIBLE
Rhône-Poulenc Rorer Ltd
RPR House, 50 Kings Hill Avenue Kings Hill
West Malling, Kent ME19 4TA / GB
Opponent's representative
Jones, Stephen Anthony
AdamsonJones Broadway Business Centre 32a Stoney Street
Nottingham NG1 1LL / GB
Former [2000/41]
Opponent(s)01  06.02.1997  18.02.1997  ADMISSIBLE
ASTA Medica AG
An der Pikardie 10
01277 Dresden / DE
Opponent's representative
Fleischer, Holm Herbert, Dr.
Sternagel, Fleischer, Godemeyer & Partner Patentanwälte Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
 02  06.02.1997  18.02.1997  ADMISSIBLE
ADIR ET COMPAGNIE
1, rue Carke Hébert
F-92145 Courbevoie Cédex / FR
Opponent's representative
ter Meer, Nicolaus, Dipl.-Chem., Dr.
TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
 03  06.02.1997  18.02.1997  ADMISSIBLE
SkyePharma AG
Eptingerstrasse 51
CH - 4132 Muttenz / CH
Opponent's representative
Zimmermann, Hans, Dr.
c/o A. Braun Braun Héritier Eschmann AG Patentanwälte VSP Holbeinstrasse 36-38 Postfach 160
4003 Basel / CH
 04  07.02.1997  18.02.1997  ADMISSIBLE
AstraZeneca AB
c/o Global Intellectual Property, Patents
151 85 Södertälje / SE
 05  07.02.1997  18.02.1997  ADMISSIBLE
Rhône-Poulenc Rorer Ltd
RPR House, 50 Kings Hill Avenue Kings Hill
West Malling, Kent ME19 4TA / GB
Opponent's representative
Caffin, Lee
Rhône-Poulenc Rorer Limited, Rainham Road South
Dagenham, Essex RM10 7XS / GB
Former [1997/14]
Opponent(s)01  06.02.1997   
ASTA Medica AG
An der Pikardie 10
01277 Dresden / DE
Opponent's representative
Fleischer, Holm Herbert
polypatent Postfach 40 02 43
51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
 02  06.02.1997   
ADIR ET COMPAGNIE
1, rue Carke Hébert
F-92145 Courbevoie Cédex / FR
Opponent's representative
ter Meer, Nicolaus
TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
 03  06.02.1997   
SkyePharma AG
Eptingerstrasse 51
CH - 4132 Muttenz / CH
Opponent's representative
Zimmermann, Hans
c/o A. Braun Braun Héritier Eschmann AG Patentanwälte VSP Holbeinstrasse 36-38 Postfach 160
4003 Basel / CH
 04  07.02.1997   
AB Astra
S-151 85 Södertälje / SE
 05  07.02.1997   
Rhône-Poulenc Rorer Ltd
RPR House, 50 Kings Hill Avenue Kings Hill
West Malling, Kent ME19 4TA / GB
Opponent's representative
Caffin, Lee
Rhône-Poulenc Rorer Limited, Rainham Road South Dagenham
Essex RM10 7XS / GB
14.03.1997Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
24.11.1997Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
02.03.1999Date of oral proceedings
16.04.1999Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
16.04.1999Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
15.05.2002Legal effect of revocation of patent [2002/38]
Appeal following opposition23.06.1999Appeal received No.  T0642/99
14.08.1999Statement of grounds filed
06.03.2001Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2001/10]
16.05.2001Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2001/20]
15.05.2002Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
15.05.2002Date of oral proceedings
13.06.2002Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[YD]EP0372777  ;
 [YD]EP0384371  ;
 [XP]EP0504112  ;
 [XP]EP0518600