Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0550031 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0550031



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 939
19.09.2012 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
05.08.2002 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
05.08.2002 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
05.08.2002 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
05.08.2002 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
05.08.2002 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
05.08.2002 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
13.06.2002 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
13.06.2002 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
13.06.2002 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
13.06.2002 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
13.06.2002 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
13.06.2002 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
15.05.2002 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 6
15.05.2002 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 30
15.05.2002 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
10.05.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
10.05.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
10.05.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
10.05.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
10.05.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
09.05.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.04.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.04.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
19.04.2002 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
19.04.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.04.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.04.2002 General authorisation Appeal 1
19.04.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
15.04.2002 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
12.04.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
12.04.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
12.04.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
11.04.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
11.04.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
11.04.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
11.04.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
10.04.2002 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
30.03.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
06.03.2002 Communication: Transfer of procedural status Appeal 1
06.03.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.03.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.03.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.03.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.03.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.03.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
27.02.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.01.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.01.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.01.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.01.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.01.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.12.2001 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Appeal 1
22.12.2001 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
22.12.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
13.11.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.11.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.11.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.11.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.11.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.11.2001 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
30.10.2001 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Opposition 23
30.10.2001 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
12.10.2001 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
12.10.2001 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
12.10.2001 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
12.10.2001 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
12.10.2001 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
04.10.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
04.10.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
11.09.2001 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.09.2001 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.09.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
08.08.2001 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
02.08.2001 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
01.08.2001 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
30.07.2001 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
30.07.2001 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
30.07.2001 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
30.07.2001 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
30.07.2001 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
30.07.2001 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
30.07.2001 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 3
19.07.2001 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
05.06.2001 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
05.06.2001 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
05.06.2001 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
05.06.2001 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
05.06.2001 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
05.06.2001 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
16.05.2001 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.05.2001 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
04.05.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.05.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.05.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.05.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.05.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.04.2001 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
12.04.2001 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
12.04.2001 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
12.04.2001 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
12.04.2001 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
12.04.2001 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
06.04.2001 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
02.03.2001 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 7
25.08.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.08.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.08.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.08.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.08.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.08.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.06.2000 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Appeal 3
10.06.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
22.05.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.05.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.05.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.05.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.05.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.05.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
04.05.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
04.05.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
04.05.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
04.05.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
04.05.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
04.05.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
19.04.2000 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
17.03.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.03.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.03.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.03.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.03.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.03.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.03.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.03.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.03.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.03.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.03.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
06.03.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
06.03.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
06.03.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
06.03.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
06.03.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
06.03.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
06.03.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 22
03.03.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
23.02.2000 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
24.01.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.01.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.01.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.01.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.01.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.01.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
29.12.1999 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
29.12.1999 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
29.12.1999 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
29.12.1999 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
29.12.1999 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
29.12.1999 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
24.12.1999 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
22.12.1999 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
09.12.1999 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
09.12.1999 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
09.12.1999 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
09.12.1999 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
09.12.1999 Preparation for oral proceedings Appeal 1
02.12.1999 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 2
27.08.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.08.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.08.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.08.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.08.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.08.1999 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
26.08.1999 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
26.08.1999 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
26.08.1999 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
26.08.1999 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
25.08.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 22
14.08.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
14.08.1999 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
14.08.1999 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 12
08.07.1999 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
05.07.1999 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
25.06.1999 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
25.06.1999 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
25.06.1999 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
25.06.1999 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
25.06.1999 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
23.06.1999 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
03.05.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
30.04.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
22.04.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
21.04.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
21.04.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
21.04.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
21.04.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
21.04.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.04.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
19.04.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
16.04.1999 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
16.04.1999 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
16.04.1999 Claims Opposition 1
16.04.1999 Claims Opposition 2
16.04.1999 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
16.04.1999 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
16.04.1999 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
16.04.1999 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
16.04.1999 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
16.04.1999 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
16.04.1999 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 4
16.04.1999 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 2
20.03.1999 Decision of the Opposition Division Opposition 1
01.03.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
24.02.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
12.02.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.02.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.02.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.02.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
10.02.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.02.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.02.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
05.02.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.02.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 6
04.02.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
04.02.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.02.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
04.02.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.02.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.02.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.02.1999 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 4
04.02.1999 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
03.02.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 15
03.02.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
02.02.1999 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 4
02.02.1999 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 12
01.02.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 16
01.02.1999 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 5
21.01.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
20.01.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
16.11.1998 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Opposition 1
16.11.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.09.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
22.09.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
22.09.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
09.03.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.03.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.03.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.03.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.03.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.03.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.03.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
27.02.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
27.02.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
26.02.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
26.02.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
26.02.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
26.02.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
23.02.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
23.02.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
21.02.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.02.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.02.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
19.02.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
18.02.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
18.02.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
16.02.1998 Annex to the communication Opposition 5
16.02.1998 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
16.02.1998 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
16.02.1998 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
16.02.1998 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
16.02.1998 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
16.02.1998 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
30.01.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
30.01.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
27.01.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
26.01.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
23.01.1998 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.01.1998 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.01.1998 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.01.1998 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.01.1998 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.01.1998 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.01.1998 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.12.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
28.11.1997 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
28.11.1997 Claims Opposition 1
28.11.1997 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
24.11.1997 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
02.10.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
24.09.1997 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
23.09.1997 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
19.09.1997 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
25.07.1997 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
24.07.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
24.07.1997 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
18.07.1997 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
25.03.1997 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
25.03.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
14.03.1997 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
14.03.1997 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
14.03.1997 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
14.03.1997 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
14.03.1997 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
14.03.1997 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
07.03.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) Opposition 1
05.03.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) Opposition 1
01.03.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) Opposition 1
26.02.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) Opposition 1
25.02.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) Opposition 1
18.02.1997 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
18.02.1997 N/A Opposition 1
18.02.1997 N/A Opposition 1
18.02.1997 N/A Opposition 1
18.02.1997 N/A Opposition 1
18.02.1997 N/A Opposition 1
14.02.1997 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
13.02.1997 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
10.02.1997 General authorisation Opposition 1
10.02.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.02.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.02.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
10.02.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
10.02.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
10.02.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
10.02.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 19
10.02.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
07.02.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
07.02.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
07.02.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
07.02.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
07.02.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
07.02.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
07.02.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
07.02.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
07.02.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
07.02.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
07.02.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 15
07.02.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 26
07.02.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
07.02.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
06.02.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
06.02.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
06.02.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
06.02.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
06.02.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 14
06.02.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 15
06.02.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
08.11.1996 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
29.10.1996 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
14.10.1996 Request for assignment Search / examination 2
28.03.1996 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
24.01.1996 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
24.01.1996 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
24.01.1996 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
07.11.1995 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
30.10.1995 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
12.10.1995 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
12.10.1995 Text intended for grant Search / examination 26
14.09.1995 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
03.08.1995 Claims Search / examination 1
03.08.1995 Description Search / examination 1
03.08.1995 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.08.1995 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
08.06.1995 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
31.05.1995 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.01.1995 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
01.04.1993 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
01.04.1993 European search report Search / examination 2
24.12.1992 Abstract Search / examination 1
24.12.1992 Claims Search / examination 2
24.12.1992 Description Search / examination 14
24.12.1992 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
24.12.1992 Drawings Search / examination 6
24.12.1992 Priority document Search / examination 14
24.12.1992 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5