Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0608441

EP0608441 - High speed upward flow filtration apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.04.1997
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 29.10.2008  [2008/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUI MINING COMPANY, LIMITED
1-1, Muromachi 2 chome, Nihonbashi Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1995/20]For all designated states
MITSUI MINING COMPANY, LIMITED
1-1, Muromachi 2 chome, Nihonbashi
Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP
Former [1994/31]For all designated states
MITSUIMIIKEKAKOUKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Muromachi, 2-chome, Nihonbashi, Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Masuda, Katsuhide
783-11, Nasecho, Totsuka-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
02 / Kuba, Yoshinori
1-7-5-203, Imaizumicho
Tochigi-shi, Tochigi-ken / JP
03 / Yamaguchi, Takashi
1080-2-1-204, Tamuracho
Tochigi-shi, Tochigi-ken / JP
04 / Ide, Katsuji
c/o Mitsui Tamura Tamura Ryo, 1080-2,Tamuracho
Tochigi-shi, Tochigi-ken / JP
[1994/31]
Representative(s)Klingseisen, Franz
Klingseisen, Rings & Partner
Patentanwälte
Bräuhausstrasse 2
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/44]Klingseisen, Franz
Klingseisen & Partner Bräuhausstrasse 2
80331 München / DE
Former [1994/31]Klingseisen, Franz, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte, Dr. F. Zumstein, Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen, Bräuhausstrasse 4
D-80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date92122098.429.12.1992
[1994/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0608441
Date:03.08.1994
Language:EN
[1994/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0608441
Date:22.05.1996
Language:EN
[1996/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.04.1993
ClassificationInternational:B01D24/26, B01D24/00, B01D24/46, B01D39/06
[1994/31]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   SE [1994/31]
TitleGerman:Hochgeschwindigkeits-Filtrationseinrichtung für aufsteigende Strömung[1994/31]
English:High speed upward flow filtration apparatus[1994/31]
French:Dispositif de filtration de débit ascendant à grande vitesse[1994/31]
Examination procedure13.09.1993Examination requested  [1994/31]
23.12.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.04.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.08.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.11.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.02.1996Fee for grant paid
08.02.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.02.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1997/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2239192  ;
 [A]EP0310310  ;
 [A]US4246119  ;
 [A]EP0001183