Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0527525 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0527525



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 804
07.12.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
21.08.2008 CDS Clean up - amended opponent data Opposition 1
17.08.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.08.2004 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
11.08.2004 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 22
18.06.2004 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 5
09.06.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.06.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
21.05.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.05.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.05.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.05.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
14.05.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
13.05.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
13.05.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
01.04.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
01.04.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.03.2004 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 11
22.03.2004 Decision to allow further processing Appeal 1
30.10.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
11.08.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.07.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.07.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
24.07.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
31.05.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
22.05.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
26.01.2000 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
07.01.2000 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 12
01.12.1999 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
01.12.1999 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
01.12.1999 Refund of fees Appeal 1
29.11.1999 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
13.11.1999 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
13.11.1999 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
04.11.1999 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
04.11.1999 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
20.09.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.09.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.09.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.09.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
31.08.1999 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
31.08.1999 Annex to a communication Opposition 14
31.08.1999 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
31.08.1999 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.08.1999 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.08.1999 Annex to a communication Opposition 8
25.08.1999 Decision of the Opposition Division Opposition 1
25.08.1999 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
25.08.1999 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
25.08.1999 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 9
20.05.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.05.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 61
11.05.1999 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
07.05.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
30.04.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
30.04.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.04.1999 Annex to the communication Opposition 6
26.04.1999 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
26.04.1999 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
23.04.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
22.04.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
20.04.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
19.04.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
13.04.1999 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
07.10.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.10.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
01.10.1998 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
01.10.1998 Claims Opposition 9
01.10.1998 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 7
25.09.1998 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 20
24.09.1998 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
24.09.1998 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 5
30.07.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
29.07.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.07.1998 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
09.07.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.07.1998 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
27.06.1998 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
26.03.1998 Annex to the communication Opposition 6
26.03.1998 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
11.02.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.02.1998 Claims Opposition 9
02.02.1998 Claims Opposition 9
02.02.1998 Claims Opposition 9
02.02.1998 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 16
11.12.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.12.1997 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
08.12.1997 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
04.12.1997 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
07.08.1997 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
07.08.1997 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
02.07.1997 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
20.06.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
20.06.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
20.06.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
20.06.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
20.06.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
20.06.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
20.06.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
20.06.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
20.06.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
20.06.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
20.06.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 38
20.06.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
20.06.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 31
20.06.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 36
20.06.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
20.06.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
20.06.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
10.09.1996 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
10.09.1996 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
09.09.1996 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
06.09.1996 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
22.08.1996 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
26.04.1996 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
26.04.1996 Translation of the claims Search / examination 9
26.04.1996 Translation of the claims Search / examination 11
20.02.1996 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
07.02.1996 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
22.12.1995 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
22.12.1995 Text intended for grant Search / examination 50
13.12.1995 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
17.11.1995 Claims Search / examination 5
17.11.1995 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
01.06.1995 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
02.11.1994 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
28.06.1994 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
09.06.1994 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
11.01.1993 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
11.01.1993 European search report Search / examination 2
30.07.1992 Abstract Search / examination 1
30.07.1992 Claims Search / examination 7
30.07.1992 Description Search / examination 21
30.07.1992 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.07.1992 Drawings Search / examination 15
30.07.1992 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
30.07.1992 Priority document Search / examination 22
30.07.1992 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5