blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0528496

EP0528496 - Polymerization of cycloolefins and catalytic system suitable for use therein [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.01.1997
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip31.01.1997Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.03.1997 [1997/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V.
Carel van Bylandtlaan 30
2596 HR Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [1993/08]For all designated states
SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V.
Carel van Bylandtlaan 30
NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Sjardijn, Willem
Badhuisweg 3
NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL
02 / Seelen-Kruijssen, Josepha Maira Elisabeth
Badhuisweg 3
NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL
[1993/08]
Application number, filing date92202503.613.08.1992
[1993/08]
Priority number, dateGB1991001774416.08.1991         Original published format: GB 9117744
[1993/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0528496
Date:24.02.1993
Language:EN
[1993/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0528496
Date:21.04.1993
Language:EN
[1993/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.03.1993
ClassificationIPC:C08G61/08
[1993/08]
CPC:
C08G61/08 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1993/08]
TitleGerman:Polymerisation von Cycloolefinen und dabei verwendetes Katalysatorsystem[1993/08]
English:Polymerization of cycloolefins and catalytic system suitable for use therein[1993/08]
French:Polymérisation de cyclooléfines et système catalytique utilisé[1993/08]
Examination procedure20.08.1993Examination requested  [1993/43]
09.05.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.09.1996Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1997/12]
23.10.1996Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1997/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.08.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
29.08.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.199605   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]EP0317262  (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD [JP]);
 [AD]EP0336486  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]);
 [AD]EP0374997  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]);
 [A]US4994426  (SJARDIJN WILLEM [NL], et al);
 [AP]EP0480447  (HERCULES INC [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.