blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0530913

EP0530913 - Magneto-optical recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.10.1998
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.1998No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.12.1998 [1998/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [1998/35]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [1997/50]For all designated states
Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [1993/10]For all designated states
Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / van Kesteren, Hans Willem
c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
02 / Zeper, Wouter Bastiaan
c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
03 / Den Broeder, Friedrich Johannes Ary
c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
04 / Kerkhof, Johannes Martinus
c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
[1993/10]
Representative(s)Stolk, Steven Adolph, et al
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [1993/10]Stolk, Steven Adolph, et al
INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date92202643.001.09.1992
[1993/10]
Priority number, dateEP1991020223703.09.1991         Original published format: EP 91202237
[1993/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0530913
Date:10.03.1993
Language:EN
[1993/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0530913
Date:10.12.1997
Language:EN
[1997/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.01.1993
ClassificationIPC:G11B11/10
[1993/10]
CPC:
G11B11/10591 (EP,US); Y10S428/90 (EP,US); Y10T428/265 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1993/10]
TitleGerman:Magnetooptisches Aufzeichnungsmedium[1993/10]
English:Magneto-optical recording medium[1993/10]
French:Milieu d'enregistrement magnéto-optique[1997/50]
Former [1993/10]Mileu d'enregistrement magnéto-optique
Examination procedure27.08.1993Examination requested  [1993/43]
26.05.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.07.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.02.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.05.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.06.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.09.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.04.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.07.1997Fee for grant paid
21.07.1997Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.09.1998No opposition filed within time limit [1998/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.09.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
02.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JP1162257  ;
 [AD]EP0304873  (SONY CORP [JP]);
 [AD]EP0376375  (PHILIPS NV [NL], et al);
 [XP]EP0449252  (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP])
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 430 (P-937)26 September 1989 & JP-A-11 62 257 ( SONY CORP. ), & JP1162257 A 19890926
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.