blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0546589

EP0546589 - Lens holding means for glasses, particularly for rimless glasses [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.05.1999
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LINDBERG, Poul J.
Skaering Strandvej 60
DK-8250 Ega / DK
[1993/24]
Inventor(s)01 / Lindberg, Poul-Jorn
Skaering Strandvej 60
DK-8250 Ega / DK
02 / Dissing, Hans
Overgaden neden Vandet 45
DK-1414 Kobenhavn K / DK
[1993/24]
Representative(s)Kraus, Jürgen Helmut, et al
Leinweber & Zimmermann
Patentanwalts-PartG mbB
Viktualienmarkt 8
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/01]Kraus, Jürgen Helmut, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al
Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7
80331 München / DE
Former [1996/02]Kyed, Iver
c/o LEHMANN & REE A/S Grundtvigsvej 37
DK-1864 Frederiksberg C / DK
Former [1995/52](deleted)
Former [1993/24]Skoett-Jensen, Knud
K. Skoett-Jensen Patentingenioerer A/S Lemmingvej 225
DK-8361 Hasselager / DK
Application number, filing date92202873.330.01.1987
[1993/24]
Priority number, dateDK1986000044930.01.1986         Original published format: DK 44986
[1993/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0546589
Date:16.06.1993
Language:EN
[1993/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.11.1992
ClassificationIPC:G02C1/02
[1993/24]
CPC:
G02C1/06 (EP); G02C1/02 (EP); G02C1/04 (EP);
G02C5/008 (EP); G02C5/2209 (EP); G02C2200/10 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1993/24]
TitleGerman:Linsenhalterung für Brillen, insbesondere für rahmenlose Brillen[1993/24]
English:Lens holding means for glasses, particularly for rimless glasses[1993/24]
French:Support pour verre de lunettes, de préférence sans monture[1993/24]
Examination procedure09.12.1993Examination requested  [1994/05]
01.08.1995Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1999/25]
01.09.1995Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [1999/25]
01.07.1997Date of oral proceedings
25.11.1997Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination26.01.1998Appeal received No.  T0338/98
25.03.1998Statement of grounds filed
02.03.1999Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
02.03.1999Date of oral proceedings
12.03.1999Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP87901400.9  / EP0256098
Request for further processing for:22.03.1993Request for further processing filed
13.04.1993Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
29.04.1993Decision despatched
Request for re-establishment of rights:01.11.1995Date of receipt
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.01.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
07.01.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
07.01.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
07.01.1993Renewal fee patent year 06
07.01.1993Renewal fee patent year 07
31.12.1993Renewal fee patent year 08
01.11.1995Renewal fee patent year 09
17.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 10
11.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 11
01.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 12
12.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 13
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.199509   M06   Fee paid on   01.11.1995
31.01.199610   M06   Fee paid on   17.07.1996
31.01.199711   M06   Fee paid on   11.04.1997
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE343622  ;
 [A]US718363  (LEMBKE EMIL L [US]);
 [A]US943085  (LAWRENCE SYDNEY S [GB]);
 [A]US2301325  (REISS JACOB C, et al);
 [A]US2439357  (BOUCHARD SAMUEL E);
 [A]EP0081179  (HAFNER KLAUS);
 [X]US4502765  (COOPER GEORGE F [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.