Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0537831

EP0537831 - Process for producing a gas with high oxygen content [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.03.2001
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 09.01.2008  [2008/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE
75, Quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/19]For all designated states
L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE
75, Quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
Former [1993/16]For all designated states
L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE
75, Quai d'Orsay
F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Hay, Léon
19, rue la Vistule
F-75013 Paris / FR
02 / Eteve, Sylvie
15, rue des Richardes
F-92260 Fontenay-aux-Roses / FR
[1993/16]
Representative(s)Polus, Camille , et al
c/o Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1996/14]Polus, Camille , et al
c/o Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves
F-75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [1993/16]Le Moenner, Gabriel , et al
L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'étude et l'exploitation des procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay
F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date92203048.105.10.1992
[1993/16]
Priority number, dateFR1991001280617.10.1991         Original published format: FR 9112806
[1993/16]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0537831
Date:21.04.1993
Language:FR
[1993/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0537831
Date:10.05.2000
Language:FR
[2000/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.01.1993
ClassificationInternational:B01D53/04, C01B13/02
[1993/16]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   IT,   NL,   SE [1993/16]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Gases mit hohem Sauerstoffgehalt[1993/16]
English:Process for producing a gas with high oxygen content[1993/16]
French:Procédé de production d'un gaz à teneur substantielle en oxygène[1993/16]
Examination procedure05.10.1992Examination requested  [1993/16]
31.01.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.07.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.10.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.04.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.12.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.06.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.09.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.03.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.01.2000Fee for grant paid
17.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.09.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
13.09.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
16.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
17.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
16.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
20.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES10.05.2000
IT10.05.2000
NL10.05.2000
SE10.08.2000
BE31.10.2000
[2008/02]
Former [2003/07]ES10.05.2000
NL10.05.2000
SE10.08.2000
BE31.10.2000
Former [2002/25]ES10.05.2000
SE10.08.2000
BE31.10.2000
Former [2002/03]SE10.08.2000
BE31.10.2000
Former [2001/27]SE10.08.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2633846  (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]);
 [A]EP0350373  (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]);
 [A]EP0248720  (AIR LIQUIDE [FR])