Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0540119

EP0540119 - Monolithic digital phaselock loop circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  12.09.1997
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.09.1997Refusal of applicationpublished on 29.10.1997 [1997/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
[N/P]
Former [1993/18]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
Old Orchard Road
Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Koskowich, Gregory N.
8806 NE 142 Street
Bothell, WA 98011 / CA
[1993/18]
Representative(s)Louet Feisser, Arnold , et al
Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [1993/18]Louet Feisser, Arnold , et al
Trenité Van Doorne European Patent Attorneys P.O. Box 75265
NL-1070 AG Amsterdam / NL
Application number, filing date92203320.428.10.1992
[1993/18]
Priority number, dateUS1991078484930.10.1991         Original published format: US 784849
[1993/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0540119
Date:05.05.1993
Language:EN
[1993/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0540119
Date:08.12.1993
Language:EN
[1993/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.10.1993
ClassificationInternational:H03L7/189, H03L7/10
[1993/42]
Former International [1993/18]H03L7/189
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1993/18]
TitleGerman:Monolitisch integrierte Phasenregelschaltung[1993/18]
English:Monolithic digital phaselock loop circuit[1993/18]
French:Boucle à verrouillage de phase en circuit intégré monolithique[1993/18]
Examination procedure19.08.1993Examination requested  [1993/42]
27.04.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.08.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.12.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.04.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.12.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
02.06.1997Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1997/44]
12.06.1997Application refused, date of legal effect [1997/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.10.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
24.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.199605   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]JP01243622  ;
 [Y]EP0402113  ;
 [X]US4531102  ;
 [X]US4975650  ;
 [A]US4764737  ;
 [A]FR2600848
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 581 (E-865)21 December 1989 & JP-A-01 243 622 ( HITACHI LTD. ) 28 September 1989, & JP01243622 A 19890928