blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0499414

EP0499414 - Pyridine derivatives as angiotensin II antagonists, processes for their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  10.05.1996
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.1996Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 26.06.1996 [1996/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zeneca Limited
15 Stanhope Gate
London W1Y 6LN / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/28]For all designated states
ZENECA LIMITED
15 Stanhope Gate
London W1Y 6LN / GB
Former [1995/10]For all designated states
Zeneca Limited
15 Stanhope Gate
London W1Y 6LN / GB
Former [1992/34]For all designated states
IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC
Imperial Chemical House, Millbank
London SW1P 3JF / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Roberts, David Anthony
Alderley Park
Macclesfield, Cheshire, GB-SK10 4TG / GB
02 / Bradbury, Robert Hugh
Alderley Park
Macclesfield, Cheshire, GB-SK10 4TG / GB
[1992/34]
Representative(s)Smith, Stephen Collyer, et al
ICI Group Patents Services Dept.
PO Box 6
Shire Park
Bessemer Road
Welwyn Garden City, Herts, AL7 1HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1992/34]Smith, Stephen Collyer, et al
ICI Group Patents Services Dept. PO Box 6 Shire Park Bessemer Road
Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB
Application number, filing date92301047.407.02.1992
[1992/34]
Priority number, dateGB1991000280411.02.1991         Original published format: GB 9102804
[1992/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0499414
Date:19.08.1992
Language:EN
[1992/34]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0499414
Date:04.11.1992
Language:EN
[1992/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.09.1992
ClassificationIPC:C07D471/04, C07D491/052, C07D495/04, A61K31/44, // (C07D471/04, 221:00, 221:00),(C07D471/04, 221:00, 209:00),(C07D491/052, 311:00, 221:00),(C07D495/04, 335:00, 221:00)
[1992/34]
CPC:
C07D471/04 (EP,US); A61P43/00 (EP); A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP); A61P9/12 (EP); C07D491/04 (EP,US);
C07D495/04 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1992/34]
TitleGerman:Pyridinderivate als Angiotensin II-Antagonisten, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und diese enthaltende pharmazeutische Zubereitungen[1992/34]
English:Pyridine derivatives as angiotensin II antagonists, processes for their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions containing them[1992/34]
French:Dérivés de pyridine comme antagonistes d'angiotensine II, procédés pour leur préparation et compositions pharmaceutiques les contenant[1992/34]
File destroyed:20.04.2002
Examination procedure13.01.1993Examination requested  [1993/11]
09.02.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.05.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.04.1996Application withdrawn by applicant  [1996/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.01.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
08.02.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US4880804  (CARINI DAVID J [US], et al);
 [XPD]WO9107404  (ICI PLC [GB]);
 [APD]EP0412848  (ICI PLC [GB])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.