Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Event history: EP0544383


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
14.03.1997 No opposition filed within time limit published on  02.05.1997 [1997/18]
22.03.1996 (Expected) grant published on  08.05.1996 [1996/19]
07.03.1996 Renewal fee
21.12.1995 Communication of intention to grant a patent
14.07.1995 Change - applicant published on  06.09.1995 [1995/36]
14.07.1995 Change - representative published on  06.09.1995 [1995/36]
15.11.1994 First examination report
20.07.1993 Request for examination filed published on  08.09.1993 [1993/36]
15.04.1993 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  02.06.1993 [1993/22]