blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0544383

EP0544383 - Method of manufacturing a heat insulation pipe body [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.03.1997
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.1997No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.05.1997 [1997/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DAIDO HOXAN INC.
2, Kita 3-Jo Nishi 1-chome Chuo-ku
Sapporo-city / JP
[1995/36]
Former [1993/22]For all designated states
DAIDOUSANSO CO., LTD.
20-16, Higashishinsaibashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 542 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yoshino, Akira
30-13, Nishiyamadai 2-chome
Osakasayama-shi, Osaka 589 / JP
[1993/22]
Representative(s)Marlow, Nicholas Simon
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
[N/P]
Former [1993/22]Marlow, Nicholas Simon
Reddie & Grose 16, Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date92301115.911.02.1992
[1993/22]
Priority number, dateJP1991033754326.11.1991         Original published format: JP 33754391
[1993/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0544383
Date:02.06.1993
Language:EN
[1993/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0544383
Date:08.05.1996
Language:EN
[1996/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.03.1993
ClassificationIPC:F16L59/02, B65H81/08
[1993/22]
CPC:
F16L59/027 (EP,US); B65H81/08 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1993/22]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Herstellen eines wärmeisolierten Rohres[1993/22]
English:Method of manufacturing a heat insulation pipe body[1993/22]
French:Procédé pour la fabrication d'une conduite isolée thermiquement[1993/22]
Examination procedure13.07.1993Examination requested  [1993/36]
18.11.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.03.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.05.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
24.08.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
30.08.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.11.1995Fee for grant paid
29.11.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.02.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1997/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US2291823  (MICKELSON ALFRED O, et al);
 [A]US3005742  (KENNEDY JR TED);
 [A]GB887345  (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE);
 [A]US3401073  (WOOD FRANK R)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.