blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0501644

EP0501644 - Winches [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.06.1998
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip12.06.1998No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.07.1998 [1998/31]
Applicant(s)For:GB 
Ford Motor Company Limited
Eagle Way Brentwood
Essex / GB
For:DE 
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Henry-Ford-Strasse 1
50725 Köln / DE
For:FR 
FORD FRANCE S.A.
B.P. 307
92506 Rueil-Malmaison Cédex / FR
[N/P]
Former [1992/36]For:GB 
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED
Eagle Way
Brentwood Essex / GB
For:DE 
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
D-50725 Köln / DE
For:FR 
FORD FRANCE S. A.
B.P. 307
F-92506 Rueil-Malmaison Cédex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Jemmeson, Howard Malcolm
8 Dilston
Danbury, Chelmsford, Essex CM3 4RN / GB
[1992/36]
Representative(s)Messulam, Alec Moses, et al
Harrison IP Limited
3 Ebor House
London Ebor Business Park
Millfield Lane
Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB
[N/P]
Former [1992/36]Messulam, Alec Moses, et al
A. Messulam & Co. 24 Broadway
Leigh on Sea Essex SS9 1BN / GB
Application number, filing date92301280.117.02.1992
[1992/36]
Priority number, dateGB1991000428128.02.1991         Original published format: GB 9104281
GB1991002159811.10.1991         Original published format: GB 9121598
[1992/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0501644
Date:02.09.1992
Language:EN
[1992/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0501644
Date:02.02.1994
Language:EN
[1994/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0501644
Date:06.08.1997
Language:EN
[1997/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.12.1993
ClassificationIPC:B66D1/60, B66D1/36, // B62D43/04
[1992/36]
CPC:
B62D43/045 (EP); B66D1/00 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1992/36]
TitleGerman:Seilwinden[1992/36]
English:Winches[1992/36]
French:Treuils[1992/36]
Examination procedure05.07.1994Examination requested  [1994/35]
18.09.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.10.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.11.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.02.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.02.1997Fee for grant paid
22.02.1997Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.05.1998No opposition filed within time limit [1998/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.01.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
13.01.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
15.01.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
11.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]SU901220  ;
 [E]EP0491513  ;
 [A]GB2124577  ;
 [A]US4884785  ;
 [A]FR2075086
 [A]  - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED Section PQ, Week J50, 2 February 1983 Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class Q, AN B1007 & SU-A-901 220 (MOSC DOM CIVIL CONS), & SU901220 A 00000000
ExaminationEP0491513
 FR2075086
 GB2124577
 US4884785
    - EP-A- 0 491 513, & EP0491513 A 00000000
    - FR-A- 2 075 086, & FR2075086 A 00000000
    - GB-A- 2 124 577, & GB2124577 A 00000000
    - US-A- 4 884 785, & US4884785 A 00000000
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.